This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/18/2021 at 15:29:21 (UTC).

VICENTE SILVA HERRERA, AN INDIVIDUAL VS A & I TRANSPORT, INC, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/05/2021 VICENTE SILVA HERRERA, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against A I TRANSPORT, INC, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0215

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HERRERA AN INDIVIDUAL VICENTE SILVA

Defendants

A & I TRANSPORT INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

VELASQUEZ AN INDIVIDUAL JOSE ARNULFO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RAFFI DANIEL J.

Defendant Attorney

YENCARELLI JENNIFER N.

 

Court Documents

Motion for Leave - MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

9/8/2021: Motion for Leave - MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Answer

2/25/2021: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

2/11/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

2/11/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

2/2/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

PI General Order

2/2/2021: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/5/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/5/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/5/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

1/5/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/02/2024
  • Hearing01/02/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • Hearing07/05/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • Hearing06/21/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • Hearing10/25/2021 at 1:30 PM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketMotion for Leave (to File First Amended Complaint); Filed by VICENTE SILVA HERRERA, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by A & I TRANSPORT, INC, a California corporation (Defendant); JOSE ARNULFO VELASQUEZ, an individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by VICENTE SILVA HERRERA, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by VICENTE SILVA HERRERA, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by VICENTE SILVA HERRERA, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by VICENTE SILVA HERRERA, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by VICENTE SILVA HERRERA, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where A & I TRANSPORT INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RAFFI DANIEL J.