This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/13/2023 at 05:19:14 (UTC).

VICENTE GARCIA FERREYRA, ET AL. VS BRIAN CHIYOUNG PARK, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/03/2021 VICENTE GARCIA FERREYRA, filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against BRIAN CHIYOUNG PARK,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0533

  • Filing Date:

    11/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BLANCO RAFAEL

FERREYRA VICENTE GARCIA

Defendants

PARK BRIAN CHIYOUNG

PARK ELENA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SWANSON BENJAMIN

Defendant Attorney

DOWNES PATRICK N

 

Court Documents

Complaint

11/3/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/3/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/3/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/3/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Proof of Personal Service

11/23/2021: Proof of Personal Service

PI General Order

11/12/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE: PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

11/12/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE: PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/7/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer

3/3/2022: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

4/26/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

3/23/2023: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/30/2024
  • Hearing10/30/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2023
  • Hearing11/15/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2023
  • Hearing11/01/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • Docket[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Signed and Filed by: Vicente Garcia Ferreyra (Plaintiff); Rafael Blanco (Plaintiff); As to: Vicente Garcia Ferreyra (Plaintiff); Rafael Blanco (Plaintiff); Brian Chiyoung Park (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • DocketPursuant to written stipulation, Final Status Conference scheduled for 04/19/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28 Not Held - Continued - Stipulation was rescheduled to 11/01/2023 10:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • DocketPursuant to written stipulation, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/03/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28 Not Held - Continued - Stipulation was rescheduled to 11/15/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Vicente Garcia Ferreyra (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Brian Chiyoung Park (Defendant); Elena Park (Defendant); As to: Vicente Garcia Ferreyra (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Vicente Garcia Ferreyra (Plaintiff); Rafael Blanco (Plaintiff); As to: Brian Chiyoung Park (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 11/27/2021; Service Cost: 248.27; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Vicente Garcia Ferreyra (Plaintiff); As to: Elena Park (Defendant); Service Date: 11/13/2021; Service Cost: 129.01; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [PI General Order], Standing Order Re: PI Procedures and Hearing Dates; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 04/19/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/03/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 10/30/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Daniel M. Crowley in Department 28 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Vicente Garcia Ferreyra (Plaintiff); Rafael Blanco (Plaintiff); As to: Brian Chiyoung Park (Defendant); Elena Park (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Vicente Garcia Ferreyra (Plaintiff); Rafael Blanco (Plaintiff); As to: Brian Chiyoung Park (Defendant); Elena Park (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Vicente Garcia Ferreyra (Plaintiff); Rafael Blanco (Plaintiff); As to: Brian Chiyoung Park (Defendant); Elena Park (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less