This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/10/2023 at 16:47:52 (UTC).

VFLA EVENTCO, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY VS WILLIAM MORRIS ENDEAVOR ENTERTAINMENT, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/16/2020 VFLA EVENTCO, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against WILLIAM MORRIS ENDEAVOR ENTERTAINMENT, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MARK H. EPSTEIN and MARC D. GROSS. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0933

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MARK H. EPSTEIN

MARC D. GROSS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Appellant

VFLA EVENTCO LLC

Respondents and Defendants

BIG GRRRL BIG TOURING INC.

KALI UCHIS TOURING INC

STARRY US TOURING INC

WILLIAM MORRIS ENDEAVOR ENTERTAINMENT LLC

Not Classified By Court

JOURNAL TECHNOLOGIES INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GELLER HARVEY W

Defendant Attorneys

MEDJUCK AVERY D.

MELONI ROBERT S.

SPRECHER MAX JOSEPH

SAVAGE DYLAN GRACE

BROD JULIAN S.

ARATO CYNTHIA S.

LEADER SUSAN KAY

 

Court Documents

Judgment

9/30/2022: Judgment

Memorandum of Costs (Summary)

10/24/2022: Memorandum of Costs (Summary)

Memorandum of Costs (Summary)

10/21/2022: Memorandum of Costs (Summary)

Memorandum of Costs (Summary)

10/21/2022: Memorandum of Costs (Summary)

Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal

10/18/2022: Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal

Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103

10/17/2022: Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103

Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed

10/7/2022: Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed

Notice of Entry of Judgment

10/6/2022: Notice of Entry of Judgment

Notice - NOTICE OF FILING [PROPOSED] JUDGMENT AND STATEMENT RE: LACK OF RESPONSE [PROPOSED] JUDGMENT FILED CONCURRENTLY HEREWITH

9/13/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF FILING [PROPOSED] JUDGMENT AND STATEMENT RE: LACK OF RESPONSE [PROPOSED] JUDGMENT FILED CONCURRENTLY HEREWITH

Order - ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTERS) ORDER(S): GRANTING WME'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; GRANTING THE ARTIST DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR

8/31/2022: Order - ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTERS) ORDER(S): GRANTING WME'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; GRANTING THE ARTIST DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTERS) ORDER(S): GRANTING WME'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; GRANTING THE ARTIST DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMA

9/1/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTERS) ORDER(S): GRANTING WME'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; GRANTING THE ARTIST DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMA

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTERS)

9/1/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTERS)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTERS)]

9/1/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTERS)]

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (BIG GRRRL BIG TOURING...)

6/17/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (BIG GRRRL BIG TOURING...)

Order - ORDER [PROPOSED] ORDER

6/17/2022: Order - ORDER [PROPOSED] ORDER

Order - ORDER GRANTING APP TO ADMIT AVERY MEDJUCK PRO HAC VICE

6/17/2022: Order - ORDER GRANTING APP TO ADMIT AVERY MEDJUCK PRO HAC VICE

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE CAROL LYNN COX, CSR 5128

6/17/2022: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE CAROL LYNN COX, CSR 5128

Notice of Appearance

6/17/2022: Notice of Appearance

319 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketAppeal Record Delivered; Issued by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs (Summary); Filed by: Starry US Touring Inc (Defendant); Kali Uchis Touring Inc (Defendant); As to: VFLA EVENTCO, LLC (Plaintiff); Total Costs: 3856.35

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Defendant Big Grrrl Big Touring, Inc.'s Response to VFLA Eventco, LLC's Additional Undisputed Supporting Facts: Exact Name: Defendant Big Grrrl Big Touring, Inc.'s Response to VFLA Eventco, LLC's Additional Undisputed Supporting Facts; As To Parties: removed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs (Summary); Filed by: Big Grrrl Big Touring, Inc. (Defendant); As to: VFLA EVENTCO, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs (Summary); Filed by: William Morris Endeavor Entertainment, LLC (Defendant); As to: VFLA EVENTCO, LLC (Plaintiff); Total Costs: 55615.97

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketAppeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • DocketAppeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103; Filed by: VFLA EVENTCO, LLC (Appellant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103: As To Parties: removed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketAppeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed; Filed by: VFLA EVENTCO, LLC (Appellant); As to: William Morris Endeavor Entertainment, LLC (Respondent); Starry US Touring Inc (Respondent); Kali Uchis Touring Inc (Respondent) et al. To be paid at Central: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment; Filed by: Starry US Touring Inc (Defendant); Kali Uchis Touring Inc (Defendant); As to: VFLA EVENTCO, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
509 More Docket Entries
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketDue to Clerical Error, Case Management Conference scheduled for 11/16/2020 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department R Not Held - Clerical Error was rescheduled to 01/13/2021 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 08/31/2020 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department R

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Case Management Conference: Result: Clerical Correction; Result Date: 07/17/2020; As To Parties: removed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Mark H. Epstein in Department R Santa Monica Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: VFLA EVENTCO, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff); As to: WILLIAM MORRIS ENDEAVOR ENTERTAINMENT, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant); STARRY US TOURING INC, a Delaware corporation (Defendant); KALI UCHIS TOURING INC, a California corporation (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: VFLA EVENTCO, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff); As to: WILLIAM MORRIS ENDEAVOR ENTERTAINMENT, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant); STARRY US TOURING INC, a Delaware corporation (Defendant); KALI UCHIS TOURING INC, a California corporation (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: VFLA EVENTCO, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff); As to: WILLIAM MORRIS ENDEAVOR ENTERTAINMENT, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant); STARRY US TOURING INC, a Delaware corporation (Defendant); KALI UCHIS TOURING INC, a California corporation (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less