This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/13/2018 at 06:09:59 (UTC).

VF EUROPE BVBA VS NEXT MANAGEMENT LLC

Case Summary

On 03/10/2017 VF EUROPE BVBA filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against NEXT MANAGEMENT LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are DALILA CORRAL LYONS and DAVID SOTELO. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3200

  • Filing Date:

    03/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

DALILA CORRAL LYONS

DAVID SOTELO

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

VF EUROPE BVBA

Defendant and Respondent

NEXT MANAGEMENT LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

CAMPBELL MARK D. ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

LAVELY & SINGER PROFESSIONAL CORP

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

2/22/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

Minute Order

3/2/2018: Minute Order

DEFENDANT NEXT MANAGEMENT, LLC'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF

12/15/2017: DEFENDANT NEXT MANAGEMENT, LLC'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT NEXT MANAGEMENT, LLC'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

12/15/2017: SEPARATE STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT NEXT MANAGEMENT, LLC'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

DECLARATION OF ALEXIS BORGES IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT NEXT MANAGEMENT, LLC'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

12/15/2017: DECLARATION OF ALEXIS BORGES IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT NEXT MANAGEMENT, LLC'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

DECLARATION OF T. WAYNE HARMAN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT NEXT MANAGEMENT, LLC'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

12/15/2017: DECLARATION OF T. WAYNE HARMAN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT NEXT MANAGEMENT, LLC'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER

11/21/2017: STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER

COMPLAINT FOR: (1) BREACH OF CONTRACT; ETC

3/10/2017: COMPLAINT FOR: (1) BREACH OF CONTRACT; ETC

SUMMONS

3/10/2017: SUMMONS

Unknown

3/16/2017: Unknown

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

3/16/2017: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

PLAINTIFF VF EUROPE, BVBA'S MOTION FOR PEREMPTORY DISQUALIFICATION IC.C. P. ? 170.61; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF; DECLARATION OF RACHEL A. STRAUS

3/24/2017: PLAINTIFF VF EUROPE, BVBA'S MOTION FOR PEREMPTORY DISQUALIFICATION IC.C. P. ? 170.61; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF; DECLARATION OF RACHEL A. STRAUS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

4/3/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

4/5/2017: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

Minute Order

4/10/2017: Minute Order

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

4/17/2017: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

4/17/2017: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, DEPARTMENT 20 INFORMATION AND MINUTE ORDER DATED APRIL 10, 2017

4/26/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, DEPARTMENT 20 INFORMATION AND MINUTE ORDER DATED APRIL 10, 2017

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2018
  • at 09:30 am in Department 20, Dalila Corral Lyons, Presiding; Motion for Summary Judgment (***OFF/CAL DISMISSAL FILED 2/22/18) - Case Dismissed/Disposed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • Request and Entry of Dismissal (WITH PREJUDICE ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • Motion for Summary Judgment; Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • Miscellaneous-Other ( SEPARATE STATEMENT ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • Declaration (OF A BORGES T W. HARMAN ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • Stipulation and Order (stipulation and protective order -as amended signed by Judge Lyons ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • Answer (TO FAC ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • Notice (OF ENTRY OF ORDER ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • at 01:30 pm in Department 20, Dalila Corral Lyons, Presiding; DEMURRER (3/15/18 RPT4/18/18 FSC4/23/18 JT) - Sustained in part

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • Miscellaneous-Other (RULING ON DEMURRER ); Filed by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 04/17/2017
  • Notice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2017
  • OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • at 10:00 am in Department 40, David Sotelo, Presiding; Affidavit of Prejudice - Case is reassigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • Order (GRANTING PLAINTIFF VF EUROPE, BVBA'S MOTION FOR PEREMPTORY DISQUALIFICATION C.C.P. 170.6 ); Filed by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons (SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • Affidavit of Prejudice--Peremptory (CASE REASSIGNED TO DEPT 20 ); Filed by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • Notice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less