This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/16/2019 at 02:00:42 (UTC).

VERSATILE COATINGS INC. VS SIERRA PACIFIC CONSTRUCTION INC.

Case Summary

On 08/13/2018 VERSATILE COATINGS INC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against SIERRA PACIFIC CONSTRUCTION INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is VIRGINIA KEENY. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7663

  • Filing Date:

    08/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

VIRGINIA KEENY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VERSATILE COATINGS INC.

Defendants

SIERRA PACIFIC CONSTRUCTION INC.

COTY INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AIRES TIMOTHY CARL

 

Court Documents

Complaint

8/13/2018: Complaint

Notice

8/13/2018: Notice

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/13/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons

8/13/2018: Summons

Request for Dismissal

11/5/2018: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/31/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department W, Virginia Keeny, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by VERSATILE COATINGS INC. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • DocketSummons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • DocketNotice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • DocketSummons; Filed by VERSATILE COATINGS INC. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by VERSATILE COATINGS INC. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less