Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/01/2021 at 14:33:42 (UTC).

VERONICA LIZARDO VS BRYAN GELFOUND

Case Summary

On 12/28/2020 VERONICA LIZARDO filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against BRYAN GELFOUND. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9388

  • Filing Date:

    12/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LIZARDO VERONICA

Defendant

GELFOUND BRYAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ZEKSTER ELAN

Defendant Attorney

GONTER K. ROBERT

 

Court Documents

Demand for Jury Trial

2/17/2021: Demand for Jury Trial

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

2/17/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Request - REQUEST FOR STATEMENT OF DAMAGES

2/17/2021: Request - REQUEST FOR STATEMENT OF DAMAGES

Answer

2/17/2021: Answer

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

2/2/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

PI General Order

2/2/2021: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/28/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/28/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/28/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

12/28/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/26/2023
  • Hearing12/26/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • Hearing06/27/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • Hearing06/13/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by BRYAN GELFOUND (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by BRYAN GELFOUND (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by BRYAN GELFOUND (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketRequest (FOR STATEMENT OF DAMAGES); Filed by BRYAN GELFOUND (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by VERONICA LIZARDO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by VERONICA LIZARDO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by VERONICA LIZARDO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ZEKSTER ELAN