This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/11/2021 at 18:45:36 (UTC).

VERONICA JOHNSON VS GOLDEN STATE WATER COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/08/2021 VERONICA JOHNSON filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against GOLDEN STATE WATER COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7114

  • Filing Date:

    10/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JOHNSON VERONICA

Defendants

CITY OF LAKEWOOD

GOLDEN STATE WATER COMPANY

 

Court Documents

Complaint

10/8/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/8/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/8/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/8/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

11/3/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

11/3/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2024
  • Hearing10/04/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2023
  • Hearing04/07/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2023
  • Hearing03/24/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Veronica Johnson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Veronica Johnson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CITY OF LAKEWOOD is a litigant

Latest cases where GOLDEN STATE WATER COMPANY is a litigant