This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/21/2022 at 14:43:56 (UTC).

VERONICA JESSICA SNYDER VS CITY OF LANCASTER, A PUBLIC ENTITY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/30/2021 VERONICA JESSICA SNYDER filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CITY OF LANCASTER, A PUBLIC ENTITY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0776

  • Filing Date:

    09/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SNYDER VERONICA JESSICA

Defendants

C. A. RASMUSSEN INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION A PUBLIC ENTITY

CITY OF LANCASTER A PUBLIC ENTITY

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES A PUBLIC ENTITY

 

Court Documents

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

10/12/2021: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT)]

10/12/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT)]

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/12/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/30/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

9/30/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/30/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2024
  • Hearing09/19/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department A14 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • Hearing12/08/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department A14 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • Hearing11/28/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department A14 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Veronica Jessica Snyder (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Veronica Jessica Snyder (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Veronica Jessica Snyder (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CA Rasmussen, Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where CITY OF LANCASTER is a litigant