This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/28/2023 at 10:34:15 (UTC).

VERONICA FLORES ET AL VS GLOBE UNION INDUSTRIAL CORP ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/31/2017 VERONICA FLORES filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against GLOBE UNION INDUSTRIAL CORP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BRIAN F. GASDIA. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3442

  • Filing Date:

    05/31/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BRIAN F. GASDIA

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

FLORES VERONICA

SANCHEZ RAMON

FLORES SERGIO

Defendants

GLOBE UNION-USA

DANZE INC.

GLOBE UNION INDUSTRIAL CORPORATION

GLOBE UNION INDUSTRIAL CORP.-TAIWAN

SERVPRO OF DOWNEY

GLOBE UNION SERVICES INC.

HOME DEPOT U.S.A. INC. DOE 51

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ZELIG STEVEN L.

Defendant Attorneys

ESTEN LAWRENCE DAVID ESQ.

DIXON ROBERT KENNETH

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

6/3/2020: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

5/11/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 05/11/2020

5/11/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 05/11/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

4/2/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/02/2020

4/2/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/02/2020

Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO PLAINTIFF RAMON SANCHEZ ONLY, FROM COMPLAINT

3/25/2020: Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO PLAINTIFF RAMON SANCHEZ ONLY, FROM COMPLAINT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (MSC))

3/13/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (MSC))

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (MSC))

3/13/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (MSC))

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED DEADLINES; PROPOSED ORDER

2/28/2020: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED DEADLINES; PROPOSED ORDER

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (MSC))

2/14/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (MSC))

Notice of Ruling

2/11/2020: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (MSC))

1/29/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (MSC))

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION DEFENDANT HOME DEPOT'S EX PAR...)

1/28/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION DEFENDANT HOME DEPOT'S EX PAR...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY (NOT "FURTHER DISCOVERY...)

1/28/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY (NOT "FURTHER DISCOVERY...)

Order - ORDER - RULING

1/28/2020: Order - ORDER - RULING

Notice - NOTICE DEFENDANT HOME DEPOT'S NOTICE OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO ADVANCE THE HEARING OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, ALTERNATIVELY, TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL RELATE

1/27/2020: Notice - NOTICE DEFENDANT HOME DEPOT'S NOTICE OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO ADVANCE THE HEARING OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, ALTERNATIVELY, TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL RELATE

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF PARADA K. ORNELAS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT HOME DEPOT'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO ADVANCE THE HEARING OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR,

1/27/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF PARADA K. ORNELAS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT HOME DEPOT'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO ADVANCE THE HEARING OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR,

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION DEFENDANT HOME DEPOT'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO ADVANCE THE HEARING OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, ALTERNATIVELY, TO CONTINUE TR

1/27/2020: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION DEFENDANT HOME DEPOT'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO ADVANCE THE HEARING OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, ALTERNATIVELY, TO CONTINUE TR

68 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Request for Dismissal: As To Parties changed from Sergio Flores (Plaintiff), Veronica Flores (Plaintiff) to Veronica Flores (Plaintiff), Sergio Flores (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • DocketHearing on Motion for Summary Judgment scheduled for 08/25/2020 at 01:30 PM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department C Not Held - Vacated by Court on 06/04/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 08/28/2020 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department F Not Held - Vacated by Court on 06/04/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. (DOE 51) (Defendant); As to: Veronica Flores (Plaintiff); Sergio Flores (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by VERONICA FLORES ET AL on 05/31/2017, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Sergio Flores and Veronica Flores as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • DocketProceeding/Event:OSC RE Dismissal Benny C. Osorio 8:30 am

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 08/28/2020 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department F

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 05/11/2020; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 06/23/2020 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department F Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 08/28/2020 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
161 More Docket Entries
  • 12/08/2017
  • DocketProceeding/Event:Informal Discovery Conference-PI Benny C. Osorio 11:00 am

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • DocketDocument:Request-Informal Discovery Conf-PI Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • DocketDocument:Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice) Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • DocketDocument:Answer Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • DocketDocument:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • DocketCalendaring:Final Status Conference 11/14/18 at 10:00 am Benny C. Osorio

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • DocketCalendaring:Trial 11/30/18 at 8:30 am Benny C. Osorio

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • DocketCalendaring:OSC RE Dismissal 06/01/20 at 8:30 am Benny C. Osorio

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • DocketCase Filed/Opened:Prdct Liablty(not asbes,tox,envir)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • DocketDocument:Complaint Filed by: N/A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC663442    Hearing Date: January 28, 2020    Dept: SEC

FLORES v. GLOBE UNION INDUSTRIAL CORP., et al.

CASE NO.: BC663442

HEARING: 1/28/20

JUDGE: MARGARET M. BERNAL

#5

TENTATIVE ORDER

I. Defendant Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.’s motion to compel responses and verification to form interrogatories (set one) is MOOT.

II. Defendant Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.’s motion to compel responses and verification to special interrogatories (set one) is MOOT.

III. Defendant Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.’s motion to compel responses and verification to requests for production of documents (set one) is MOOT.

IV. Defendant Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.’s motion to compel responses and verification to request for admissions is MOOT.

Sanctions are imposed against Plaintiffs Veronica Flores, Sergio Flores, and Ramon Sanchez, jointly and severally, in the sum of $2,467.50, payable within 30 days.

Moving Party to give NOTICE.

Defendant Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. moves for verified responses to form interrogatories, special interrogatories, document demands, and request for admissions per CCP 2030.290, 2031.300, and 2033.280.

CCP 2030.290(b) and 2031.300(b) allow the propounding party to file a motion to compel responses to interrogatories and document demands if a response has not been received. If responses are untimely, responding party waives objections. (CCP 2030.290(a) and 2031.300(a).) CCP 2033.280(b) and (c) allow the propounding party to file a motion requesting that the truth of any matters specified in the request for admissions be deemed admitted unless the party to whom the requests have been directed has served before the hearing a proposed response that is in substantial compliance.

Prior to the hearing on these motions, Plaintiffs have served verified responses. Therefore, the motions are MOOT.

Sanctions: CCP 2023.010(d), 2030.290(c) and 2031.300(c) authorize the court to impose sanctions for failure to respond to discovery without substantial justification. CCP 2033.280 makes the imposition of sanctions mandatory if a party fails to serve a timely response to requests for admission. “The court may award sanctions under the Discovery Act in favor of a party who files a motion to compel discovery, even though no opposition to the motion was filed, or opposition to the motion was withdrawn, or the requested discovery was provided to the moving party after the motion was filed.”  (CRC 3.1348(a); .”  (Sinaiko Healthcare Consulting, Inc. v. Pacific Healthcare Consultants (2007) 148 Cal.App.4th 390, 408-409.)

Here, sanctions are appropriate because Plaintiffs failed to serve timely responses to discovery, and imposition of sanctions is mandatory because Plaintiffs failed to timely respond to request for admissions. The court finds Defendant’s total request of $2,467.50 is reasonable under the circumstances. Sanctions are imposed against Plaintiffs Veronica Flores, Sergio Flores, and Ramon Sanchez, jointly and severally, in the sum of $2,467.50, payable within 30 days.