This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/08/2022 at 09:07:02 (UTC).

VERONICA ELIAS VS SANDRA GOMEZ, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/28/2021 VERONICA ELIAS filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SANDRA GOMEZ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LIA MARTIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3505

  • Filing Date:

    01/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LIA MARTIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ELIAS VERONICA

Defendants

GOMEZ SANDRA

POSITIVE INVESTMENTS INC.

3236 60TH STREET LP DOE 1

4028 PALMWOOD LLC DOE 2

PI PROPERTIES NO. 81 LLC DOE 4

TDI PROPERTIES INC. DOE 3

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

DECKER KATRINA CHRISTINE

LAVI DANIEL J.

Defendant Attorneys

HUSSAIN SAMEER ARIANA

PARTIDA GUILLERMO ENGELBERT

REAGAN BARRY JAMES

SOLTIS ALEXANDRA ELIZABETH

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

12/1/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

Status Conference Report

11/16/2022: Status Conference Report

Status Report

11/16/2022: Status Report

Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING ON MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF VERONICA ELIASS DISCOVERY RESPONSES TO (1) FORM INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE

9/26/2022: Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING ON MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF VERONICA ELIASS DISCOVERY RESPONSES TO (1) FORM INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY (NOT "FURTHER DISCOVERY...)

9/21/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY (NOT "FURTHER DISCOVERY...)

Order - ORDER [PROPOSED] ORDER ON DEFENDANT POSITIVE INVESTMENT, INC.S MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF VERONICA ELIAS RESPONSES TO DISCOVERY HRG: 02-15-2024 [RES. #277705756834]

9/21/2022: Order - ORDER [PROPOSED] ORDER ON DEFENDANT POSITIVE INVESTMENT, INC.S MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF VERONICA ELIAS RESPONSES TO DISCOVERY HRG: 02-15-2024 [RES. #277705756834]

Order - ORDER COURTS CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER

7/19/2022: Order - ORDER COURTS CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

7/19/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice - NOTICE DEFENDANT PI PROPERTIES, NO. 81 LLC'S NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF VERONICA ELIAS'S DISCOVERY RESPONSES

9/14/2022: Notice - NOTICE DEFENDANT PI PROPERTIES, NO. 81 LLC'S NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF VERONICA ELIAS'S DISCOVERY RESPONSES

Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET ONE

9/19/2022: Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET ONE

Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF VERONICA ELIAS'S RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE

9/19/2022: Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF VERONICA ELIAS'S RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

6/23/2022: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

6/23/2022: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

6/23/2022: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Case Management Statement

6/28/2022: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

6/28/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

7/5/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

7/6/2022: Case Management Statement

55 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/22/2024
  • Hearing04/22/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department 16 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2024
  • Hearing04/12/2024 at 09:30 AM in Department 16 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2024
  • Hearing02/15/2024 at 09:00 AM in Department 16 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery Responses to Form Interrogatories, Set one; Filed by Defendant Positive Investments, Inc.; ***3 Motion on 1 Pleadings***

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • Hearing02/17/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department 16 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • Hearing02/17/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department 16 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • Hearing01/30/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department 16 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Further Status Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketFurther Status Conference scheduled for 12/01/2022 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 16 updated: Result Date to 12/01/2022; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketStatus Report; Filed by: TDI Properties, Inc. (Doe 3) (Defendant); 3236 60TH Street LP (Doe 1) (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketStatus Conference Report; Filed by: Positive Investments, Inc. (Defendant); PI Properties No. 81, LLC (Doe 4) (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
112 More Docket Entries
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 07/19/2022 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 16

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 06/28/2021 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 16

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 06/28/2021 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 16

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Veronica Elias (Plaintiff); As to: Sandra Gomez (Defendant); POSITIVE INVESTMENTS, INC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Veronica Elias (Plaintiff); As to: Sandra Gomez (Defendant); POSITIVE INVESTMENTS, INC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Veronica Elias (Plaintiff); As to: Sandra Gomez (Defendant); POSITIVE INVESTMENTS, INC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by: Veronica Elias (Plaintiff); As to: Sandra Gomez (Defendant); POSITIVE INVESTMENTS, INC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Lia Martin in Department 16 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where POSITIVE INVESTMENTS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SOLTIS ALEXANDRA ELIZABETH

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PARTIDA GUILLERMO ENGELBERT

Latest cases represented by Lawyer REAGAN BARRY JAMES