Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/04/2019 at 01:12:23 (UTC).

VERONICA CIFUENTES ANGEL VS ROGER CHEN

Case Summary

On 09/20/2018 VERONICA CIFUENTES ANGEL filed a Labor - Wage Claim lawsuit against ROGER CHEN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is EDWARD B. MORETON. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5222

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wage Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

EDWARD B. MORETON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

ANGEL VERONICA CIFUENTES

Appellant

CHEN ROGER

Not Classified By Court

TEST PARTY FOR TRUST CONVERSION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAVI DAVID

Appellant Attorneys

HOLLOWAY KEVIN ESQ.

HOLLOWAY KEVIN B. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Case Management Statement

1/3/2019: Case Management Statement

Objection

1/16/2019: Objection

Notice of Deposit - Jury

1/18/2019: Notice of Deposit - Jury

Certificate of Mailing for

1/18/2019: Certificate of Mailing for

Minute Order

1/18/2019: Minute Order

Order

1/24/2019: Order

Certificate of Mailing for

1/25/2019: Certificate of Mailing for

Stipulation and Order

3/21/2019: Stipulation and Order

Request for Dismissal

4/30/2019: Request for Dismissal

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR DEPT 44 ONLY-LABOR COMMISSIONER APPEAL

9/25/2018: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR DEPT 44 ONLY-LABOR COMMISSIONER APPEAL

NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

9/20/2018: NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

NOTICE OF APPEAL

9/20/2018: NOTICE OF APPEAL

NOTICE OF POSTING OF UNDERTAKING

9/20/2018: NOTICE OF POSTING OF UNDERTAKING

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/30/2019
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Veronica Cifuentes Angel (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • Stipulation and Order (RE RELEASE OF FUNDS DEPOSITED WITH THE COURT CLERK); Filed by Veronica Cifuentes Angel (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for ([Minute Order (Case Management Conference)]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • at 09:30 AM in Department 44, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • Notice of Deposit - Jury; Filed by Veronica Cifuentes Angel (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Case Management Conference) of 01/18/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • Order (case management conference order); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • Objection (TO ROGER CHEN'S OFFER TO COMPROMISE); Filed by Veronica Cifuentes Angel (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • Case Management Statement; Filed by Roger Chen (Appellant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR DEPT 44 ONLY-LABOR COMMISSIONER APPEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • NOTICE OF POSTING OF UNDERTAKING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • Notice of Appeal; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • NOTICE OF APPEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TEST PARTY FOR TRUST CONVERSION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HOLLOWAY KEVIN B.