This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/09/2021 at 19:00:20 (UTC).

VERONICA ADAMS VS CURO GROUP HOLDINGS CORP., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/27/2020 VERONICA ADAMS filed an Other lawsuit against CURO GROUP HOLDINGS CORP . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RUTH ANN KWAN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2337

  • Filing Date:

    03/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RUTH ANN KWAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ADAMS VERONICA

Defendants

AD ASTRA RECOVERY SERVICES INC.

SPEEDY CASH CORP. DBA SPEEDY CASH DBA SPEEDY CASH INSTALLMENT LOANS FDBA RAPID CASH

CURO GROUP HOLDINGS CORP. DBA SPEEDY CASH DBA SPEEDY CASH INSTALLMENT LOANS DBA RAPID CASH

GALT VENTURES LLC DBA SPEEDY CASH DBA SPEEDY CASH INSTALLMENT LOANS DBA RAPID CASH

DOES 1-100

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MILLIGAN FLINN T.

Defendant Attorney

GALE PAUL L.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT;)

8/19/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT;)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT;) OF 08/19/2020

8/19/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT;) OF 08/19/2020

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/1/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Removal to Federal Court

5/1/2020: Notice of Removal to Federal Court

Answer - ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

4/27/2020: Answer - ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

Answer

4/27/2020: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

4/15/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

4/15/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

4/15/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

4/15/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/27/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/27/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/27/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

3/27/2020: Complaint

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/10/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 72, Ruth Ann Kwan, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • Docketat 10:49 AM in Department 72, Ruth Ann Kwan, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order re: notice of removal to federal court;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: notice of removal to federal court;) of 08/19/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • DocketNotice of Removal to Federal Court; Filed by Curo Group Holdings Corp. (Defendant); Galt Ventures, LLC (Defendant); Speedy Cash Corp. (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Curo Group Holdings Corp. (Defendant); Galt Ventures, LLC (Defendant); Speedy Cash Corp. (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketAnswer (to Complaint); Filed by Curo Group Holdings Corp. (Defendant); Galt Ventures, LLC (Defendant); Speedy Cash Corp. (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Veronica Adams (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Veronica Adams (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Veronica Adams (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Veronica Adams (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Veronica Adams (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Veronica Adams (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Veronica Adams (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GALT VENTURES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where CURO GROUP HOLDINGS CORP. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where AD Astra Recovery Services, Inc. is a litigant