This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/24/2023 at 23:57:55 (UTC).

VERNELOU TERRY VS EMBASSY SUITES BY HILTON-LAX

Case Summary

On 03/13/2020 VERNELOU TERRY filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against EMBASSY SUITES BY HILTON-LAX. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMAS D. LONG. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0400

  • Filing Date:

    03/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

THOMAS D. LONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TERRY VERNELOU

Defendant

EMBASSY SUITES BY HILTON-LAX

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RECHS RANDALL

 

Court Documents

PI General Order

3/26/2020: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

3/26/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/25/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/13/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/13/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/13/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

3/13/2020: Complaint

Request for Dismissal

10/2/2020: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 08/27/2021 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/05/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/10/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/05/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 03/10/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/05/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Vernelou Terry on 03/13/2020, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Vernelou Terry as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Vernelou Terry (Plaintiff); As to: Embassy Suites by Hilton-LAX, (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 08/27/2021 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/10/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 03/10/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Thomas D. Long in Department 31 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Vernelou Terry (Plaintiff); As to: Embassy Suites by Hilton-LAX, (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Vernelou Terry (Plaintiff); As to: Embassy Suites by Hilton-LAX, (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Vernelou Terry (Plaintiff); As to: Embassy Suites by Hilton-LAX, (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less