This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/29/2019 at 02:23:19 (UTC).

VERMONT ENTERTAINMENT VILLAGE LLC VS COUNTY OF LA ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/08/2018 VERMONT ENTERTAINMENT VILLAGE LLC filed an Other - Writ Of Mandamus lawsuit against COUNTY OF LA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1844

  • Filing Date:

    01/08/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Writ Of Mandamus

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VERMONT ENTERTAINMENT VILLAGE LLC

Defendants

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES BOARD OF

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SILVERSTEIN ROBERT P. ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

SONIA CHAN SENIOR ASSOC COUNTY COUNSEL

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

2/5/2018: Minute Order

NOTICE OF FILING PROOFS OF SERVICE

2/13/2018: NOTICE OF FILING PROOFS OF SERVICE

NOTICE OF COURT ORDER RE CASE ASSIGNMENT

2/13/2018: NOTICE OF COURT ORDER RE CASE ASSIGNMENT

STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE APRIL 5, 2018 TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE TO MAY 31, 2018

4/3/2018: STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE APRIL 5, 2018 TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE TO MAY 31, 2018

Minute Order

4/5/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

5/17/2018: Minute Order

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

5/17/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

6/20/2018: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

NOTICE OF FILING PROOFS OF SERVICE REGARDING SERVICE OF VERIFIED FIRST AMENDED PETITION FOR PEREMPTORY WRIT OF MANDATE AND COMPLAINT ON RESPONDENTS

3/14/2018: NOTICE OF FILING PROOFS OF SERVICE REGARDING SERVICE OF VERIFIED FIRST AMENDED PETITION FOR PEREMPTORY WRIT OF MANDATE AND COMPLAINT ON RESPONDENTS

VERIFIED FIRST AMENDED PETITION FOR PEREMPTORY WRIT OF MANDATE AND COMPLAINT

3/5/2018: VERIFIED FIRST AMENDED PETITION FOR PEREMPTORY WRIT OF MANDATE AND COMPLAINT

Minute Order

3/5/2018: Minute Order

JOINT STIPULATION REGARDING CONTINUANCE OF MARCH 29, 2018 STATUS CONFERENCE; AND ORDER

3/5/2018: JOINT STIPULATION REGARDING CONTINUANCE OF MARCH 29, 2018 STATUS CONFERENCE; AND ORDER

JOINT STIPULATION REGARDING COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES AND LOS ANGELES BOARD OF SUPERVISORS' DEADLINE TO FILE AND SERVE RESPONSIVE PLEADING ETC.

2/16/2018: JOINT STIPULATION REGARDING COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES AND LOS ANGELES BOARD OF SUPERVISORS' DEADLINE TO FILE AND SERVE RESPONSIVE PLEADING ETC.

NOTICE OF COURT ORDER RE STATUS CONFERENCE

2/13/2018: NOTICE OF COURT ORDER RE STATUS CONFERENCE

RESPONDENTS' NOTICE OF SETTING A TIME AND PLACE FOR A SETTLEMENT MEETING

1/30/2018: RESPONDENTS' NOTICE OF SETTING A TIME AND PLACE FOR A SETTLEMENT MEETING

Minute Order

2/7/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

2/8/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

1/25/2018: Minute Order

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2018
  • DocketNotice; Filed by Vermont Entertainment Village LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal & P/S; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 82; Trial Setting Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • Docketat 4:30 PM in Department 82; Non-Appearance Case Review (Non-Appearance (Case Review); Order of Dismissal) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 86; Trial Setting Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 82; Trial Setting Conference (Trial Setting Conference; Continued by Stipulation) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
39 More Docket Entries
  • 01/18/2018
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF NOTICE OF INTENTION TO FILE CEQA PETITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • DocketRequest; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • DocketPetition; Filed by null

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • DocketNOTICE TO ATTORNEY GENERAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • DocketPETITIONER'S NOTICE OF REQUEST AND REQUEST FOR HEARING ON PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE PURSUANT TO PUB. RES. CODE 21167.4(A) AND NOTICE TO PARTIES OF REQUEST PURSUANT TO PUB. RES. CODE 21167.4(B)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • DocketNotice; Filed by Vermont Entertainment Village LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PREPARATION OF RECORD OF PROCEEDINGS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • DocketVERIFIED PETITION FOR PEREMPTORY WRIT OF MANDATE AND COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Complaint Information

ORIGIHAL

THE SILVERSTEIN LAW FIRM, APC ROBERT P. SILVERSTEIN (State Bar No. 185105) DANIEL E. WRIGHT (State B(;ilr No. 144490)

215 North Marengo Avenue, 3â„¢ Floor

Pasadena, CA 91101-1504

Telephone: 56263 449-4200

Facsimile: 626) 449-4205

Attorneys for Petitioner VERMONT ENTERTAINMENT VILLAGE, LLC

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

VERMONT ENTERTAINMENT CASE No. BS171844 VILLAGE, LLC

NOTICE OF FILING PROOFS OF "

Petitioner, SERVICE REGARDING SERVICE OF |

VERIFIED FIRST AMENDED | |

VSs. PETITION FOR PEREMPTORY WR

? OF MANDATE AND COMPLAINT ON-

| COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, a public RESPONDENTS

entity; COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

1 through 10, inclusive, Time: 1:30 p.m

Dept.: 82

Respondents.

[Hon. Mary H. Strobel]

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VERMONT ENTERTAINMENT VILLAGE LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SILVERSTEIN ROBERT PAUL