This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/12/2023 at 00:16:37 (UTC).

VERLINE LIGGINS VS MARIO A. CHAVEZ, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/02/2022 VERLINE LIGGINS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MARIO A CHAVEZ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Burbank Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0897

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LIGGINS VERLINE

Defendants

CHAVEZ MARIO A.

NBCUNIVERSAL LLC DBA NBCUNIVERSAL MEDIA LLC

UNIVERSAL CITY STUDIOS LLC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SETAREH DANIEL OMID

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/2/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

11/2/2022: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/2/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/2/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

11/3/2022: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/3/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

12/28/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

12/30/2022: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Request for Dismissal

1/5/2023: Request for Dismissal

Reply - REPLY PLAINTIFF'S RESPOSNE TO OSC AND DECLARATION OF COUNSEL RE REQUEST TO VACATE OSC

1/5/2023: Reply - REPLY PLAINTIFF'S RESPOSNE TO OSC AND DECLARATION OF COUNSEL RE REQUEST TO VACATE OSC

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/28/2023
  • Hearing03/28/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department B at 300 East Olive, Burbank, CA 91502; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketReply Plaintiff's Resposne to OSC and Declaration of Counsel re Request to Vacate OSC; Filed by: Verline Liggins (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Verline Liggins on 11/02/2022, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Verline Liggins as to NBCUniversal, LLC dba NBCUniversal Media, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Verline Liggins (Plaintiff); As to: NBCUniversal, LLC dba NBCUniversal Media, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 01/12/2023 at 08:30 AM in Burbank Courthouse at Department B Not Held - Vacated by Court on 01/04/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by: Verline Liggins (Plaintiff); As to: Universal City Studios, LLC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Verline Liggins (Plaintiff); As to: NBCUniversal, LLC dba NBCUniversal Media, LLC (Defendant); Service Date: 12/07/2022; Service Cost: 49.50; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 01/12/2023 at 08:30 AM in Burbank Courthouse at Department B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 03/28/2023 at 08:30 AM in Burbank Courthouse at Department B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. John J. Kralik in Department B Burbank Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Verline Liggins (Plaintiff); As to: Mario A. Chavez (Defendant); NBCUniversal, LLC dba NBCUniversal Media, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Verline Liggins (Plaintiff); As to: Mario A. Chavez (Defendant); NBCUniversal, LLC dba NBCUniversal Media, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Verline Liggins (Plaintiff); As to: Mario A. Chavez (Defendant); NBCUniversal, LLC dba NBCUniversal Media, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NBCUNIVERSAL INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Universal City Studios Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SETAREH DANIEL ESQ.