This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/04/2019 at 02:46:52 (UTC).

VERDELL ADAMS VS VILLAGE HEALTH FOUNDATION INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/01/2018 VERDELL ADAMS filed an Other lawsuit against VILLAGE HEALTH FOUNDATION INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are CHRISTOPHER K. LUI and RICHARD L. FRUIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3854

  • Filing Date:

    10/01/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

CHRISTOPHER K. LUI

RICHARD L. FRUIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ADAMS VERDELL

Defendants

RONDON MARIA ELENA L.A.C.

VILLAGE HEALTH FOUNDATION INC. DBA THE VILLAGE HEALTH CENTER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HALPERN JASON PAUL

Defendant Attorneys

KADISH MICHAEL B

KADIN DAVID

 

Court Documents

Order - ORDER DETERMINING SETTLEMENT TO BE MADE IN GOOD FAITH SIGNED AND FILED.

8/5/2019: Order - ORDER DETERMINING SETTLEMENT TO BE MADE IN GOOD FAITH SIGNED AND FILED.

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT ...)

8/5/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT ...)

Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement (CCP 877.6)

7/8/2019: Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement (CCP 877.6)

Notice - NOTICE TAKING HEARING ON PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND MOTION TO STAY OFF CALENDAR

7/11/2019: Notice - NOTICE TAKING HEARING ON PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND MOTION TO STAY OFF CALENDAR

Notice of Motion

7/11/2019: Notice of Motion

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE RE LINDA LEE, 13568

5/2/2019: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE RE LINDA LEE, 13568

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (MOTION OF DEFT VILLAGE HEALTH TO COMPEL ARBITRATION [13026033...)

5/2/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (MOTION OF DEFT VILLAGE HEALTH TO COMPEL ARBITRATION [13026033...)

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

4/8/2019: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

4/8/2019: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Reply - REPLY MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND MOTION TO STAY; REQUEST FOR STATEMENT OF DECISION

4/11/2019: Reply - REPLY MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND MOTION TO STAY; REQUEST FOR STATEMENT OF DECISION

Notice of Hearing on Petition - NOTICE OF HEARING ON PETITION NON-OPPOSITION

3/28/2019: Notice of Hearing on Petition - NOTICE OF HEARING ON PETITION NON-OPPOSITION

Opposition - OPPOSITION SECOND AMENDED PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY PROCEEDINGS

3/20/2019: Opposition - OPPOSITION SECOND AMENDED PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY PROCEEDINGS

Notice of Hearing on Petition - NOTICE OF HEARING ON PETITION 2ND

3/14/2019: Notice of Hearing on Petition - NOTICE OF HEARING ON PETITION 2ND

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

3/14/2019: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Motion for Order - Motion for Order TO COMPEL ARBITRATION; NOTICE OF MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF JEWEL THAIS-WILLIAMS IN SUPPORT THEREOF; PROPOSED

2/26/2019: Motion for Order - Motion for Order TO COMPEL ARBITRATION; NOTICE OF MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF JEWEL THAIS-WILLIAMS IN SUPPORT THEREOF; PROPOSED

Amended Complaint - Amended Complaint Amended Petititon to Compel Arbitration

2/26/2019: Amended Complaint - Amended Complaint Amended Petititon to Compel Arbitration

Notice of Hearing on Petition

3/1/2019: Notice of Hearing on Petition

Opposition - Opposition to Amended Petition to Compel Arbitration

3/6/2019: Opposition - Opposition to Amended Petition to Compel Arbitration

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2020
  • Hearing02/04/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department 15 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: completion of Arbitration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 15, Richard L. Fruin, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement (CCP 877.6) (by Plaintiff as to Deft. Maria Elena Rondon, L.A.C. [931468718456]*) - Held - Motion Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • DocketOrder (Determining settlement to be made in good faith signed and filed.); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement ...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 15, Richard L. Fruin, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration (by Defendant Village Health Foundation [130260339804]) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 15, Richard L. Fruin, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration (by Defendant Maria Elena Rondon, L.A.C. [187415791389]) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • DocketNotice (TAKING HEARING ON PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND MOTION TO STAY OFF CALENDAR); Filed by Village Health Foundation, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • DocketNotice of Motion; Filed by Maria Elena Rondon, L.A.C. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • DocketMotion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement (CCP 877.6); Filed by Verdell Adams (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 15, Richard L. Fruin, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration (by Defendant Village Health Foundation [130260339804]) - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 01/10/2019
  • DocketNotice of Hearing on Petition; Filed by Maria Elena Rondon, L.A.C. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • DocketNotice (NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO PETITION BY DEFENDANT VILLAGE HEALTH FOUNDATION FOR AN ORDER COMPELLING ARBITRATION AND TO STAY PROC); Filed by Maria Elena Rondon, L.A.C. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • DocketMotion to Compel Arbitration (And Stay Proceedings); Filed by Maria Elena Rondon, L.A.C. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • Docketpetition order compelling arbitration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Verdell Adams (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • DocketVERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KADISH, MICHAEL B.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KADIN DAVID