This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/18/2022 at 03:25:47 (UTC).

VENTURA, MARIA ANTONIA - DECEDENT

Case Summary

On 11/16/2020 VENTURA, MARIA ANTONIA - DECEDENT was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LUNA, ANA MARIA. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9588

  • Filing Date:

    11/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LUNA, ANA MARIA

 

Party Details

Petitioner

VENTURA DAVID A.

Decedent

VENTURA MARIA ANTONIA

Others

JACKSON JANET

VENTURA JESUS

Not Classified By Court

KRAAKEVIK PATTI

Interested Party

RMO LLP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

MARTINEZ SAMI RENE

Other Attorney

MOTEN KEITH JOSEPH

Interested Party Attorney

BAKER MATTHEW FORREST

 

Court Documents

Assignment

8/27/2021: Assignment

Assignment

10/15/2021: Assignment

Notice - Hearing - Notice of Hearing

11/15/2021: Notice - Hearing - Notice of Hearing

Account - Final or Waiver - Account - Final or Waiver

11/15/2021: Account - Final or Waiver - Account - Final or Waiver

Notice - Hearing

11/22/2021: Notice - Hearing

Miscellaneous Document - DEMAND FOR PAYMENT

1/20/2022: Miscellaneous Document - DEMAND FOR PAYMENT

Supplement - First Supplement Petition Final Distribution

1/21/2022: Supplement - First Supplement Petition Final Distribution

Minute Order

1/24/2022: Minute Order

Notice - Hearing

1/27/2022: Notice - Hearing

Request - Special Notice

1/27/2022: Request - Special Notice

Proof of Service

1/28/2022: Proof of Service

Minute Order

2/9/2022: Minute Order

PR_General Probate - Proposed Order Rejected

2/24/2022: PR_General Probate - Proposed Order Rejected

PR_General Probate - Proposed Order Rejected

3/11/2022: PR_General Probate - Proposed Order Rejected

Order - Final Distribution

4/5/2022: Order - Final Distribution

Receipt - Receipt on Payment

4/15/2022: Receipt - Receipt on Payment

Receipt - Receipt on Final Distribution

4/15/2022: Receipt - Receipt on Final Distribution

Receipt - Receipt on Final Distribution

4/15/2022: Receipt - Receipt on Final Distribution

41 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

04/15/2022

DocketReceipt (Receipt on Payment ); Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/15/2022

DocketReceipt (Receipt on Final Distribution ); Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/15/2022

DocketReceipt (Receipt on Final Distribution_Janet ); Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/15/2022

DocketReceipt (Receipt on Final Distribution ); Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/15/2022

DocketEx Parte - Petition for Final Discharge and Order; Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/05/2022

DocketOrder - Final Distribution

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/11/2022

DocketRejected Proposed Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/24/2022

DocketRejected Proposed Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/09/2022

Docketin Probate Department 11, Luna, Ana Maria, Presiding; Accounting Hearing - Held

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/09/2022

DocketPetition Granted

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
75 More Docket Entries
12/16/2020

DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/16/2020

DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Decedent

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/08/2020

DocketSupplement (Supplement to Petition for Probate ); Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/04/2020

DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/03/2020

DocketProof of Publication (Proof of Publication ); Filed by Attorney

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/18/2020

DocketNotice - Petition to Administer Estate (Notice of Petition to Administer Estate ); Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/16/2020

DocketConfidential Supplement to Duties and Liabilities; Filed by Attorney

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/16/2020

DocketPetition - Letters of Administration (Initial); Filed by Attorney

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/16/2020

DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/16/2020

DocketDuties and Liabilities - Personal Representative; Filed by Attorney

[+] Read More [-] Read Less