This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/14/2019 at 09:21:00 (UTC).

VEACH, CATHERINE MARGERETTE - DECEDENT

Case Summary

On 07/06/2017 VEACH, CATHERINE MARGERETTE - DECEDENT was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JUAREZ, DANIEL, JOHNSON, BARBARA R., COWAN, DAVID J. and SUZUKI, PAUL T.. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5988

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

JUAREZ, DANIEL

JOHNSON, BARBARA R.

COWAN, DAVID J.

SUZUKI, PAUL T.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

THORNTON JAMES C. JR

Decedent

VEACH CATHERINE MARGERETTE

Not Classified By Court

MCGREW DONALD L.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

CHINSKI TOBI JO

 

Court Documents

Petition - Probate of Will (Initial) - ORIGINAL WILL Submitted on 07/07/17

7/6/2017: Petition - Probate of Will (Initial) - ORIGINAL WILL Submitted on 07/07/17

Notice - Hearing - Probate Hearing 8/8/2017

7/14/2017: Notice - Hearing - Probate Hearing 8/8/2017

Notice - Petition to Administer Estate - Notice of Petition to Administer Estate

7/21/2017: Notice - Petition to Administer Estate - Notice of Petition to Administer Estate

Proof of Publication - Proof of Publication

7/21/2017: Proof of Publication - Proof of Publication

Minute Order

8/8/2017: Minute Order

Notice - Hearing - Notice of Hearing - Continuance

8/23/2017: Notice - Hearing - Notice of Hearing - Continuance

Declaration - Declaration

8/23/2017: Declaration - Declaration

Notice - Hearing - Notice of Hearing

8/23/2017: Notice - Hearing - Notice of Hearing

Notice - Petition to Administer Estate - Notice of Petition to Administer Estate

8/25/2017: Notice - Petition to Administer Estate - Notice of Petition to Administer Estate

Minute Order

9/20/2017: Minute Order

Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative

9/20/2017: Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative

Will - Admitted

9/20/2017: Will - Admitted

Order - Order for Probate

10/5/2017: Order - Order for Probate

Letters (Initial)

10/13/2017: Letters (Initial)

Notice - to Franchise Tax Board

10/19/2017: Notice - to Franchise Tax Board

Application/Order - Appointing Probate Referee - Application/Order - Appointing Probate Referee

10/19/2017: Application/Order - Appointing Probate Referee - Application/Order - Appointing Probate Referee

Receipt - - Franchise Tax Board

12/12/2017: Receipt - - Franchise Tax Board

Inventory & Appraisal - Final

2/5/2018: Inventory & Appraisal - Final

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/29/2018
  • DocketTERM: Approval of Final Distribution

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • DocketEx Parte - Petition for Final Discharge and Order; Filed by Attorney

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • Docketin Probate Department 79, Suzuki, Paul T., Presiding; OSC Re Petition for Final Distribution or Status Report - Held - OSC Hearing Off Calendar

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • DocketReceipt - Distribution (Receipt ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • DocketOrder (Order Settling Waiver of First and Final Account ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • Docketin Probate Department 79, Juarez, Daniel, Presiding; Accounting Hearing - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • DocketPetition Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • DocketNotice - Hearing (Notice of Hearing ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 08/23/2017
  • DocketDeclaration (Declaration ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • DocketNotice - Hearing (Notice of Hearing ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • DocketNotice - Hearing (Notice of Hearing - Continuance ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • Docketin Probate Department 79, Johnson, Barbara R., Presiding; Appointment Hearing - Decedent's Estate - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • DocketProof of Publication (Proof of Publication ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • DocketNotice - Petition to Administer Estate (Notice of Petition to Administer Estate ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • DocketNotice - Hearing (Probate Hearing 8/8/2017 ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • DocketPetition - Probate of Will (Initial) (ORIGINAL WILL Submitted on 07/07/17 ); Filed by Attorney

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less