This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/13/2021 at 09:02:44 (UTC).

VAZQUEZ ESPARZA, FRANCISCO JAVIER VS CHAVEZ, TONY

Case Summary

On 06/12/2020 VAZQUEZ ESPARZA, FRANCISCO JAVIER filed a Family - Harassment lawsuit against CHAVEZ, TONY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are SHORT, MICHELLE, ROSENBLOOM, JONATHAN L, RIFF, LAWRENCE P. and BYRD, CHRISTINE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0698

  • Filing Date:

    06/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

SHORT, MICHELLE

ROSENBLOOM, JONATHAN L

RIFF, LAWRENCE P.

BYRD, CHRISTINE

 

Party Details

Petitioner

VAZQUEZ ESPARZA FRANCISCO JAVIER

Respondent

CHAVEZ TONY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

ABDOLHOSSEINI TINA H.

MOGHBELI KIAN

Respondent Attorney

HILLAND DONALD ARTHUR

 

Court Documents

Declaration - Of Karla Marroquin In Support Of The Transcription Of The Audio From The Video Of Incident Of May 31, 2020

9/2/2020: Declaration - Of Karla Marroquin In Support Of The Transcription Of The Audio From The Video Of Incident Of May 31, 2020

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

8/27/2020: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

Minute Order

8/28/2020: Minute Order

Restraining Order After Hearing (Form 130) - Civil Harrassment

8/28/2020: Restraining Order After Hearing (Form 130) - Civil Harrassment

Supplemental - Declaration of Olivia Vazquez

8/26/2020: Supplemental - Declaration of Olivia Vazquez

Supplemental - Declaration of Amy Santos

8/26/2020: Supplemental - Declaration of Amy Santos

Supplemental - Declaration of Fernando Juarez

8/26/2020: Supplemental - Declaration of Fernando Juarez

Minute Order

8/27/2020: Minute Order

Minute Order

8/27/2020: Minute Order

Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003

7/1/2020: Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003

170.6 CCP Peremptory Challenge

7/1/2020: 170.6 CCP Peremptory Challenge

Request to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115)

7/1/2020: Request to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115)

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

7/2/2020: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

Stipulation - Joint Stipulation to continue hearing

7/2/2020: Stipulation - Joint Stipulation to continue hearing

Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109) - Granted

6/12/2020: Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109) - Granted

Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

6/12/2020: Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

Proof of Service - CH109, CH110, CH120

6/19/2020: Proof of Service - CH109, CH110, CH120

Proof of Service - CH109, CH110, CH120

6/22/2020: Proof of Service - CH109, CH110, CH120

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/02/2020
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid V; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid A; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid V; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (Of Karla Marroquin In Support Of The Visual Transcription Of The Videos From The Incident Of May 31, 2020 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (Of Karla Marroquin In Support Of The Transcription Of The Audio From The Video Of Incident Of May 31, 2020 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 42, Byrd, Christine, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Granted - RO After Evidence by both

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketRestraining Order After Hearing (Form 130) (Civil Harrassment ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketOrder (Court's Ruling on Petitioner's Objections to Respondent's Excerpts to Deposition of Nicole Wall Taken April 13, 2019 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketOrder (Court's Evidentiary Rulings on Respondent's Objection to and Request to Strike Certain Portions of Petitioner's Designation of the Deposition Transcript of Nicole Wall dated April 3, 2019 )

    Read MoreRead Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 07/01/2020
  • Docket170.6 CCP Peremptory Challenge; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketResponse - Civil Harassment; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketResponse - Civil Harassment; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • DocketProof of Service (CH109, CH110, CH120 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketProof of Service (CH109, CH110, CH120 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109) (Granted ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • DocketPetition - Civil Harassment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MOGHBELI KIAN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TINA ABDOLHOSSEINI H.