This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/30/2023 at 12:57:43 (UTC).

VASQUEZ, JOSUE ALEXANDER BARAHONA VS CARDENAS, MILGIEN TERESA GONZALEZ

Case Summary

On 09/13/2021 VASQUEZ, JOSUE ALEXANDER BARAHONA filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against CARDENAS, MILGIEN TERESA GONZALEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are PELLMAN, AMY M. and RIFF, LAWRENCE P.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0004

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

PELLMAN, AMY M.

RIFF, LAWRENCE P.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

VASQUEZ JOSUE ALEXANDER BARAHONA

Respondent

CARDENAS MILGIEN TERESA GONZALEZ

Not Classified By Court

GASCON GEORGE - District Attorney

 

Court Documents

Notice - Of Application for the return of the Minor Child Under the Hague Convention on the Civil Aspects of International Child Abduction

9/13/2021: Notice - Of Application for the return of the Minor Child Under the Hague Convention on the Civil Aspects of International Child Abduction

Miscellaneous - Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus and Order

9/13/2021: Miscellaneous - Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus and Order

Miscellaneous - Points and Authorities in Support of Expedited Proceedings Under the Hague Convention on the Civil Aspects of International Child Abduction

9/13/2021: Miscellaneous - Points and Authorities in Support of Expedited Proceedings Under the Hague Convention on the Civil Aspects of International Child Abduction

Miscellaneous - Writ of Habeas Corpus

9/13/2021: Miscellaneous - Writ of Habeas Corpus

Miscellaneous - Memorandum of Law: The Convention on The Civil Aspects of International Child Abduction, Done At The Hogue, Oct. 25, 1980; And The International Child Abduction Remedies Act, 22 U.S.C

9/13/2021: Miscellaneous - Memorandum of Law: The Convention on The Civil Aspects of International Child Abduction, Done At The Hogue, Oct. 25, 1980; And The International Child Abduction Remedies Act, 22 U.S.C

Petition - Habeas Corpus - Family Law

9/13/2021: Petition - Habeas Corpus - Family Law

Minute Order

11/18/2021: Minute Order

Proof of Service

11/22/2021: Proof of Service

Minute Order

12/16/2021: Minute Order

Minute Order

12/16/2021: Minute Order

Proof of Service - Proof of Personal Service

1/18/2022: Proof of Service - Proof of Personal Service

 

Docket Entries

01/18/2022

DocketProof of Service (Proof of Personal Service ); Filed by District Attorney - Central Authority

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/16/2021

Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 2, Pellman, Amy M., Presiding; Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal/Sanctions - Held - Order Made

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/16/2021

Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 2, Pellman, Amy M., Presiding; Habeas Corpus Hearing - Held - Order Made

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/16/2021

DocketMinute Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/16/2021

DocketMinute Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/22/2021

DocketProof of Service; Filed by District Attorney - Central Authority

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/18/2021

Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 2, Riff, Lawrence P., Presiding; Habeas Corpus Hearing - Held - Continued

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/18/2021

DocketMinute Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/15/2021

DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Child

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2021

DocketNotice (Of Application for the return of the Minor Child Under the Hague Convention on the Civil Aspects of International Child Abduction ); Filed by District Attorney - Central Authority

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2021

DocketMiscellaneous (Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus and Order ); Filed by District Attorney - Central Authority

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2021

DocketMiscellaneous (Writ of Habeas Corpus ); Filed by District Attorney - Central Authority

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2021

DocketMiscellaneous (Memorandum of Law: The Convention on The Civil Aspects of International Child Abduction, Done At The Hogue, Oct. 25, 1980; And The International Child Abduction Remedies Act, 22 U.S.C 9001. est. seq. ); Filed by District Attorney - Central Authority

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2021

DocketMiscellaneous (Points and Authorities in Support of Expedited Proceedings Under the Hague Convention on the Civil Aspects of International Child Abduction ); Filed by District Attorney - Central Authority

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2021

DocketPetition - Habeas Corpus - Family Law; Filed by District Attorney - Central Authority

[+] Read More [-] Read Less