Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/09/2021 at 04:39:44 (UTC).

VASQUEZ, JOSE, JR VS MARTINEZ, ELSA PATRICIA

Case Summary

On 01/12/2021 VASQUEZ, JOSE, JR filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against MARTINEZ, ELSA PATRICIA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CHRISTIAN, H. DON. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0039

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pomona Courthouse South

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CHRISTIAN, H. DON

 

Party Details

Petitioner

VASQUEZ JOSE JR

Respondent

MARTINEZ ELSA PATRICIA

 

Court Documents

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

2/2/2021: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

Minute Order

2/2/2021: Minute Order

Stipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner

2/2/2021: Stipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner

Minute Order

2/8/2021: Minute Order

Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

1/12/2021: Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

1/12/2021: Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

Request - DV Prevention w/o Minor Child (Case Initiation)

1/12/2021: Request - DV Prevention w/o Minor Child (Case Initiation)

Proof of Service - Mail

1/15/2021: Proof of Service - Mail

Response - Domestic Violence

1/15/2021: Response - Domestic Violence

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/08/2021
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department C, Christian, H. Don, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Denied - RO- After Evidence by both

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • Docketat 2:00 PM in Department C, Christian, H. Don, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Held - Continued, TRO Reissued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketStipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - Mail; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketResponse - Domestic Violence; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketRequest - DV Prevention w/o Minor Child (Case Initiation); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less