This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/14/2019 at 08:34:01 (UTC).

VASILIOS PAVLAKIS VS FORMOSA CAFE INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/19/2017 VASILIOS PAVLAKIS filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against FORMOSA CAFE INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7500

  • Filing Date:

    12/19/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

PAVLAKIS VASILIOS

Defendants and Respondents

FORMOSA CAFE' INC

JUN VINCENT L.

DOES 1 TO 100

JUNG VINCENT L.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

SHEPARD ZACHARY J. ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

BURNS ELKANAH J. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

PLAINTIFF VASILIOS PAVLAKIS' COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES BASED ON: 1. FAILURE TO PAY EARNED WAGES ;ETC

12/19/2017: PLAINTIFF VASILIOS PAVLAKIS' COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES BASED ON: 1. FAILURE TO PAY EARNED WAGES ;ETC

SUMMONS

12/19/2017: SUMMONS

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

1/2/2018: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Unknown

1/2/2018: Unknown

CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

8/2/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

Minute Order

8/2/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

5/2/2018: Minute Order

VINCENT JUNG'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

4/18/2018: VINCENT JUNG'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

Unknown

4/17/2018: Unknown

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

4/13/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

3/15/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

Minute Order

3/2/2018: Minute Order

CIVIL DEPOSIT

2/27/2018: CIVIL DEPOSIT

SUMMONS ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

1/24/2018: SUMMONS ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

PLAINTIFF VASILIOS PAVLAKIS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES BASED ON: 1. FAILURE TO PAY EARNED WAGES 2. FAILURE TO PAY THE MINIMUM WAGE (CAL. LAB. C. SEC. 1194, APPLICABLE IWC WAGE ORDERS); ETC.

1/24/2018: PLAINTIFF VASILIOS PAVLAKIS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES BASED ON: 1. FAILURE TO PAY EARNED WAGES 2. FAILURE TO PAY THE MINIMUM WAGE (CAL. LAB. C. SEC. 1194, APPLICABLE IWC WAGE ORDERS); ETC.

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/02/2018
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 61; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service (OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Trial Date Set) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • DocketCase Management Order; Filed by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 61; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • DocketVINCENT JUNG'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Vincent L. Jung (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Vincent L. Jung (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 01/24/2018
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • DocketPLAINTIFF VASILIOS PAVLAKIS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES BASED ON: 1. FAILURE TO PAY EARNED WAGES 2. FAILURE TO PAY THE MINIMUM WAGE (CAL. LAB. C. SEC. 1194, APPLICABLE IWC WAGE ORDERS); ETC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • DocketOSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • DocketPLAINTIFF VASILIOS PAVLAKIS' COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES BASED ON: 1. FAILURE TO PAY EARNED WAGES ;ETC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Vasilios Pavlakis (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****7500    Hearing Date: August 17, 2020    Dept: 61

  1. MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT

Code Civ. Proc. section 664.6 states that:

If parties to pending litigation stipulate, in a writing signed by the parties outside the presence of the court or orally before the court, for settlement of the case, or part thereof, the court, upon motion, may enter judgment pursuant to the terms of the settlement. If requested by the parties, the court may retain jurisdiction over the parties to enforce the settlement until performance in full of the terms of the settlement.

“Section 664.6 permits the trial court judge to enter judgment on a settlement agreement without the need for a new lawsuit. [Citation.] It is for the trial court to determine in the first instance whether the parties have entered into an enforceable settlement. [Citation.] In making that determination, ‘the trial court acts as the trier of fact, determining whether the parties entered into a valid and binding settlement. [Citation.] Trial judges may consider oral testimony or may determine the motion upon declarations alone. [Citation.] When the same judge hears the settlement and the motion to enter judgment on the settlement, he or she may consult his [or her] memory. [Citation.]’ [Citation.]” (Osumi v. Sutton (2007) 151 Cal.App.4th 1355, 1359–1360.)

Pavlakis points to the settlement agreement executed on November 1, 2019, in which Defendants agreed to pay $82,500 to Pavalakis in exchange for a release of claims. (Shepard Decl. Exh. A.) The agreement, executed by Jung individually and as representative for Formosa Café, states that if Defendants default on the agreement, Pavlakis may “take judgment against Defendants by way of stipulated judgment in the amount of $125,000, plus any accumulated interest accrued from the date of execution of this Agreement.” (Shepard Decl. Exh. A.) Because Defendants failed to make the payment by the agreed date of March 30, 2020, Pavlakis brings the present motion seeking entry of stipulated judgment in the amount of $125,000 plus pre-judgment interest at 7% from November 15, 2019, as well as attorney fees to be adduced at hearing based on the attorney’s rate of $525 per hour. (Motion at p. 5.)

The court concludes that Pavlakis has satisfied his burden to show the existence of an enforceable settlement agreement between himself and defendants, and breach of same. No opposition to the motion has been filed. The motion is therefore GRANTED.