This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/25/2020 at 01:18:19 (UTC).

VARTAN ADZHEMYAN VS ZABEL ISABEL ALEPYAN ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/20/2018 VARTAN ADZHEMYAN filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against ZABEL ISABEL ALEPYAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are HOLLY E. KENDIG, DEBRE K. WEINTRAUB and ELAINE LU. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4688

  • Filing Date:

    02/20/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

HOLLY E. KENDIG

DEBRE K. WEINTRAUB

ELAINE LU

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

ADZHEMYAN VARTAN

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 TO 100

ALL PERSONS CLAIMING ANY LEGAL OR EQUIT-

ELIZAROV ARTHUR

ALEPYAN ZABEL ISABEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

HOVSEPIAN RAYMOND

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

LAW OFFIE OF ILYA ALEKSEYEFF

ALEKSEYEFF ILYA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2021
  • Hearing03/01/2021 at 09:30 AM in Department 26 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • Hearing03/01/2021 at 09:30 AM in Department 26 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • Hearing02/11/2021 at 09:00 AM in Department 26 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 26, Elaine Lu, Presiding; Final Status Conference ((JT 07/06/20)) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • Docketat 3:00 PM in Department 26, Elaine Lu, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • Docketat 3:00 PM in Department 26, Elaine Lu, Presiding; Final Status Conference ((JT 07/06/20)) - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Final Status Conference (JT 07/06/20))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketStipulation and Order (to continue trial etc); Filed by Zabel Isabel Alepyan (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 26, Elaine Lu, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • Docketat 3:47 PM in Department 26, Elaine Lu, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
41 More Docket Entries
  • 05/01/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE & OSC RE PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Vartan Adzhemyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • DocketVERIFIED COMPLAINT: (1) TO QUIET TITLE TO REAL PROPFRTY; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC694688    Hearing Date: June 23, 2020    Dept: 26

IN ORDER TO IMPLEMENT PHYSICAL DISTANCING AND UNTIL FURTHER NOTICE, THE COURT STRONGLY ENCOURAGES ALL COUNSEL AND ALL PARTIES TO APPEAR REMOTELY FOR NON-TRIAL AND NON-EVIDENTIARY MATTERS, INCLUDING THIS MOTION.

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 26

Vartan adzhemyan,

Plaintiff,

v.

zabel isabel alepyan, et al.,

Defendants.

Case No.: BC694688

Hearing Date: June 23, 2020

[TENTATIVE] order RE:

CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL AND FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE; motion to be relieved as counsel

TRIAL CONTINUANCE

Based on current conditions, including, but not limited to, the COVID-19 pandemic, the need for social distancing, a state of emergency having been declared by Governor Newsom, and the unavailability of civil jurors on the current trial date, the court finds good cause to continue the final status conference and trial dates in this case.

On the court’s own motion, the final status conference is continued to February 11, 2021 at 9:00 am, and the trial is continued to March 1, 2021 at 9:30 am. Discovery and motion cut-off dates are to follow the new trial date.

MOTION TO BE RELIEVED

Defense counsel, Ilya Alekseyeff (“Counsel”), moves to be relieved as counsel for Defendant Zabel Isabel Alepyan (“Client”). On April 6, 2020 Counsel filed the instant motion to be relieved as counsel.

Counsel has filed a form MC-051 and MC-052 and has electronically lodged with the Court a copy of the proposed order on form MC-053 pursuant to CRC Rule 3.1362. However, Counsel has not provided any proof of service. Thus, there is no evidence before the Court that all parties have received proper notice of this motion.

Counsel is ordered prior to the hearing on this motion to electronically file proof of service of the motion (MC-051), declaration (MC-052), and proposed order (MC-053) on all parties, including opposing parties and including Client. If Counsel fails to file proof of timely service of the moving papers, the motion will be denied without prejudice, and Counsel will have to file proof of service on all parties with any renewed motion to be relieved.

If Counsel files proof of timely service of the moving papers, the Court will proceed to address the merits of the motion to be relieved as follows:

The MC-052 form states that Counsel served Client via mail at Client’s last known mailing address, which Counsel states Counsel has confirmed as current within 30 days of the motion by text messages.

Counsel states that Counsel has discovered a conflict of interest with Client and cannot continue to represent Client but can continue to represent Defendant Artur Elizarov.

Counsel is ordered to electronically file a revised proposed order on form MC-053 prior to the hearing on this motion. Based on the notice of motion and the declaration filed by Counsel, the Court is inclined to grant the motion. However, the proposed order on form MC-053 must be updated to reflect the new trial and FSC dates, which the Court has set above. The proposed order must identify all upcoming hearings and list the address of the Court in all items. The proposed order on form MC-053 must include the following additional language:

DATED: June 23, 2020 ___________________________

Elaine Lu

Judge of the Superior Court