This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/06/2022 at 06:19:42 (UTC).

VARGAS, AZARIA VS VARGAS, CRISTIAN

Case Summary

On 11/12/2020 VARGAS, AZARIA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against VARGAS, CRISTIAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ARIAN, LEE S.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1792

  • Filing Date:

    11/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ARIAN, LEE S.

 

Party Details

Petitioners

VARGAS ARARIA

VARGAS AZARIA

Respondent

VARGAS CRISTIAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

WOODBURY ROBERT CRAIG

Respondent Attorney

SUA BRANDON MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

Declaration - Community and Quasi-Community Property - Declaration - Community and Quasi-Community Property

4/7/2022: Declaration - Community and Quasi-Community Property - Declaration - Community and Quasi-Community Property

Declaration - UCCJEA - Declaration - UCCJEA

4/7/2022: Declaration - UCCJEA - Declaration - UCCJEA

Notice - Change of Address

4/7/2022: Notice - Change of Address

Request - Enter Default FL165 - Rejected

4/7/2022: Request - Enter Default FL165 - Rejected

FCS-Mediation Memo

9/30/2021: FCS-Mediation Memo

Minute Order

11/12/2021: Minute Order

Mail - Certificate of Mailing

9/8/2021: Mail - Certificate of Mailing

Minute Order

8/25/2021: Minute Order

Proof of Service - Mail - Summons, Petition, Blank response to Petition for Dissolution

8/25/2021: Proof of Service - Mail - Summons, Petition, Blank response to Petition for Dissolution

Declaration - Income and Expense

8/25/2021: Declaration - Income and Expense

Proof of Service of Summons

8/2/2021: Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service - Income and Expense Declaration, Notice of Hearing, RFO

8/2/2021: Proof of Service - Income and Expense Declaration, Notice of Hearing, RFO

FCS-Mediation Memo

7/14/2021: FCS-Mediation Memo

Order - on Request to Reschedule Hearing

5/26/2021: Order - on Request to Reschedule Hearing

Notice - Ruling - RE: RFO Hearing of 05/26/2021

5/28/2021: Notice - Ruling - RE: RFO Hearing of 05/26/2021

Mail - Certificate of Mailing

6/21/2021: Mail - Certificate of Mailing

Request - Continue Hearing

5/18/2021: Request - Continue Hearing

Minute Order

5/26/2021: Minute Order

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketNotice - Change of Address; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketDeclaration - Community and Quasi-Community Property (Declaration - Community and Quasi-Community Property ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA (Declaration - UCCJEA ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketRequest - Enter Default FL165 (Rejected ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department F46, Arian, Lee S., Presiding; Request for Order Hearing - Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Clerk (Emailed to apet :Mediation Letter and Webex Appointment, Mediation Intake Form, QRG-Webex & DV FC3044 Handout )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketMail - Certificate of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department F46, Arian, Lee S., Presiding; Request for Order Hearing - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Community and Quasi-Community Property; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketOrder - Family-Centered Case Resolution Conference (FAM 112)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketFee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketNotice - Case Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketFee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WOODBURY ROBERT