This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/13/2023 at 14:31:10 (UTC).

VARDGES GAZAZYAN VS RESMIK HAIRAPETIAN

Case Summary

On 10/10/2022 VARDGES GAZAZYAN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against RESMIK HAIRAPETIAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Burbank Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JOHN J. KRALIK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0733

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JOHN J. KRALIK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GAZAZYAN VARDGES

Defendant

HAIRAPETIAN RESMIK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KHACHATRIAN ARTHUR

SOGOYAN JACK

Defendant Attorney

MOSKOVIAN ANY

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/10/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/10/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/10/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

10/10/2022: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/10/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

10/10/2022: Complaint

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/20/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Declaration - NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

11/18/2022: Declaration - NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

Answer

11/18/2022: Answer

Demand for Jury Trial

11/18/2022: Demand for Jury Trial

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

11/18/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

1/25/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 01/25/2023

1/25/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 01/25/2023

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/25/2023
  • Hearing05/25/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department B at 300 East Olive, Burbank, CA 91502; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 05/25/2023 at 08:30 AM in Burbank Courthouse at Department B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 01/25/2023; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Case Management Conference scheduled for 03/09/2023 at 08:30 AM in Burbank Courthouse at Department B Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 05/25/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service of the Summons and Complaint scheduled for 12/27/2022 at 08:30 AM in Burbank Courthouse at Department B Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court on 12/13/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Resmik Hairapetian (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Resmik Hairapetian (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by: Resmik Hairapetian (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearance; Filed by: Resmik Hairapetian (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Vardges Gazazyan (Plaintiff); As to: Resmik Hairapetian (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 10/19/2022; Service Cost: 75.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 12/27/2022 at 08:30 AM in Burbank Courthouse at Department B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 03/09/2023 at 08:30 AM in Burbank Courthouse at Department B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. John J. Kralik in Department B Burbank Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Vardges Gazazyan (Plaintiff); As to: Resmik Hairapetian (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Vardges Gazazyan (Plaintiff); As to: Resmik Hairapetian (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Vardges Gazazyan (Plaintiff); As to: Resmik Hairapetian (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less