This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/05/2021 at 04:27:44 (UTC).

VANIA NEMANPOUR, ET AL. VS PORSCHE CARS NORTH AMERICA, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/08/2021 VANIA NEMANPOUR filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against PORSCHE CARS NORTH AMERICA, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are WILLIAM F. FAHEY and MICHAEL L. STERN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5202

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

WILLIAM F. FAHEY

MICHAEL L. STERN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

NEMANPOUR VANIA

ROSHANKASHANI HOUSHANG

Defendants

BHP HOLDING PARTNERS LTD. DBA BEVERLY HILLS PORSCHE

PORSCHE CARS NORTH AMERICA INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WIRTZ RICHARD

Defendant Attorney

WEBB JEREMIAH P.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

9/24/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 09/24/2021, FINAL TRIAL PREPARATION

9/24/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 09/24/2021, FINAL TRIAL PREPARATION

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

10/1/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

10/1/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO SET ASIDE AND VACATE DEFAULT AND ORDER

8/19/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO SET ASIDE AND VACATE DEFAULT AND ORDER

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

8/24/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER RE CMC

8/24/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER RE CMC

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

8/24/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

8/24/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER RE CASE REASSIGNMENT

8/24/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER RE CASE REASSIGNMENT

Answer

8/24/2021: Answer

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: JOINT STIPULATION TO SET ASIDE AND VACATE DEF...) OF 08/19/2021

8/19/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: JOINT STIPULATION TO SET ASIDE AND VACATE DEF...) OF 08/19/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION DEFENDANTS EX PARTE APPLICATI...)

8/19/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION DEFENDANTS EX PARTE APPLICATI...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: JOINT STIPULATION TO SET ASIDE AND VACATE DEF...)

8/19/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: JOINT STIPULATION TO SET ASIDE AND VACATE DEF...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

8/19/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

8/11/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION DEFENDANTS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING THE TIME TO FILE AND BE HEARD ON MOTION TO VACATE ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND FOR LEAVE TO FILE DEFENDANTS

8/17/2021: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION DEFENDANTS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING THE TIME TO FILE AND BE HEARD ON MOTION TO VACATE ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND FOR LEAVE TO FILE DEFENDANTS

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

8/17/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/11/2022
  • Hearing04/11/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 62 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • Hearing03/24/2022 at 09:00 AM in Department 62 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Vania Nemanpour (Plaintiff); Houshang Roshankashani (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Vania Nemanpour (Plaintiff); Houshang Roshankashani (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • Docketat 3:28 PM in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 09/24/2021, Final Trial Preparation); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Vania Nemanpour (Plaintiff); Houshang Roshankashani (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Entry of Order re CMC); Filed by Vania Nemanpour (Plaintiff); Houshang Roshankashani (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Porsche Cars North America, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by Vania Nemanpour (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Department 69 Online Courtroom Information); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Vania Nemanpour (Plaintiff); Houshang Roshankashani (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Vania Nemanpour (Plaintiff); Houshang Roshankashani (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Vania Nemanpour (Plaintiff); Houshang Roshankashani (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Vania Nemanpour (Plaintiff); Houshang Roshankashani (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Vania Nemanpour (Plaintiff); Houshang Roshankashani (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PORSCHE CARS NORTH AMERICA INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where BEVERLY HILLS PHYSICIANS A BUSINESS ENTITY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WIRTZ RICHARD M.