This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/08/2021 at 10:19:02 (UTC).

VANESSA KLINGER BY AND THROUGH HER GUARDIAN AD LITEM, RICH KLINGER VS CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL OF LOS ANGELES, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/07/2021 VANESSA KLINGER BY AND THROUGH HER GUARDIAN AD LITEM, RICH KLINGER filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL OF LOS ANGELES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0588

  • Filing Date:

    01/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VANESSA KLINGER BY AND THROUGH HER GUARDIAN AD LITEM RICH KLINGER

Defendants

KRIEGER MARK M.D.

BOWEN IRA M.D.

CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL OF LOS ANGELES

PERNICIARO JESSICA M.D.

GOLDBERG BRADLEY M.D.

SMITH MATTHEW M.D.

CHIARELLI PETER M.D.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

KARPEL DONALD E.

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

2/1/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

PI General Order

2/1/2021: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/26/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR VANESSA

1/15/2021: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR VANESSA

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/7/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/7/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

1/7/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2024
  • Hearing01/04/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • Hearing07/07/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • Hearing06/23/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Vanessa Klinger by and through her Guardian Ad Litem, Rich Klinger (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for Vanessa); Filed by Vanessa Klinger by and through her Guardian Ad Litem, Rich Klinger (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Vanessa Klinger by and through her Guardian Ad Litem, Rich Klinger (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Vanessa Klinger by and through her Guardian Ad Litem, Rich Klinger (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KARPEL DONALD E. ESQ.