This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/14/2023 at 09:12:10 (UTC).

VANESSA JOHNSON VS WAL-MART ASSOCIATES, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 09/09/2022 VANESSA JOHNSON filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against WAL-MART ASSOCIATES, INC , A DELAWARE CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JON R. TAKASUGI. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9319

  • Filing Date:

    09/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JON R. TAKASUGI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JOHNSON VANESSA

Defendant

WAL-MART ASSOCIATES INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NALBANDYAN A. JACOB

Defendant Attorney

KOZLOWSKA CLAUDIA

 

Court Documents

Proof of Personal Service

9/12/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/12/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/9/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

9/9/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/9/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/9/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

9/9/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

9/9/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Complaint

9/9/2022: Complaint

Answer

10/11/2022: Answer

Notice of Removal to Federal Court

10/12/2022: Notice of Removal to Federal Court

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

11/23/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 12/21/2022

12/21/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 12/21/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

12/21/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT)

1/19/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT) OF 01/19/2023

1/19/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT) OF 01/19/2023

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketNon-Appearance Case Review re: Removal to Federal Court scheduled for 01/19/2023 at 11:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 17 updated: Result Date to 01/19/2023; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketCase is Deemed Complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review re: Removal to Federal Court)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review re: Removal to Federal Court) of 01/19/2023; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketThe case is removed from the special status of: Stay - Removal to Federal Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketNon-Appearance Case Review re: Removal to Federal Court scheduled for 01/19/2023 at 11:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 17

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review) of 12/21/2022; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Case Management Conference scheduled for 01/09/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 17 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 12/21/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Vanessa Johnson (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Vanessa Johnson (Plaintiff); As to: Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., a Delaware Corporation (Defendant); Service Date: 09/12/2022; Service Cost: 99.15; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Vanessa Johnson (Plaintiff); As to: Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., a Delaware Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Vanessa Johnson (Plaintiff); As to: Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., a Delaware Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Vanessa Johnson (Plaintiff); As to: Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., a Delaware Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Jon R. Takasugi in Department 17 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less