This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/11/2021 at 14:49:32 (UTC).

VANESSA GUADALUPE MARTINEZ VS FOOD 4 LESS OF CALIFORNIA, INC.

Case Summary

On 06/08/2021 VANESSA GUADALUPE MARTINEZ filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against FOOD 4 LESS OF CALIFORNIA, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1384

  • Filing Date:

    06/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARTINEZ VANESSA GUADALUPE

Defendants

FOOD 4 LESS OF CALIFORNIA INC.

GASKA INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ZEYTUNTSYAN ANDREW

Defendant Attorney

D'ORO FRANK

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/1/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Demand for Jury Trial

7/30/2021: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer

7/30/2021: Answer

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

6/9/2021: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

6/22/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

6/22/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

6/22/2021: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/8/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/8/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/8/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

6/8/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2024
  • Hearing06/04/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • Hearing12/06/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • Hearing11/22/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by VANESSA GUADALUPE MARTINEZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by FOOD 4 LESS OF CALIFORNIA, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by FOOD 4 LESS OF CALIFORNIA, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by VANESSA GUADALUPE MARTINEZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketAmended Complaint ((1st)); Filed by VANESSA GUADALUPE MARTINEZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by VANESSA GUADALUPE MARTINEZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by VANESSA GUADALUPE MARTINEZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by VANESSA GUADALUPE MARTINEZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GASKA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where FOOD 4 LESS OF CALIFORNIA, INC. is a litigant