This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/21/2022 at 06:48:11 (UTC).

VANESSA ESCALERA VS VANDERVEER INDUSTRIAL PLASTICS, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/12/2021 VANESSA ESCALERA filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against VANDERVEER INDUSTRIAL PLASTICS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7310

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ESCALERA VANESSA

Defendants

TRAN FRANCIS

VANDERVEER INDUSTRIAL PLASTICS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

DOUMANIAN NANCY PRAPION

MALCZYNSKI MATTHEW

STERN GLENN E.

Defendant Attorneys

NAVASARTIAN DAVID OWEN

HAUBRICH JOHN

 

Court Documents

Motion for Change of Venue

12/22/2021: Motion for Change of Venue

Substitution of Attorney

1/4/2022: Substitution of Attorney

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 01/05/2022

1/5/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 01/05/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

1/5/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Notice of Lien

1/18/2022: Notice of Lien

Association of Attorney

2/14/2022: Association of Attorney

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER TO TRANSFER VENUE TO ORANGE COUNTY

2/18/2022: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER TO TRANSFER VENUE TO ORANGE COUNTY

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR CHANGE OF VENUE)

2/22/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR CHANGE OF VENUE)

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

2/23/2022: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Notice of Ruling

3/15/2022: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE PAYMENT OF TRANSFER FEES BY PLA...)

4/7/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE PAYMENT OF TRANSFER FEES BY PLA...)

Notice of Outgoing Transfer

4/19/2022: Notice of Outgoing Transfer

Receipt for Transmitted Record

4/19/2022: Receipt for Transmitted Record

Certificate - CLERK'S CERTIFICATION OF REPRODUCED COURT RECORDS

4/19/2022: Certificate - CLERK'S CERTIFICATION OF REPRODUCED COURT RECORDS

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF NANCY DOUMANIAN CONFIRMING PROOF OF SERVICE OF MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL AND ALL MOVING PAPERS ON THE PLAINTIFF (12-21-21)

12/21/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF NANCY DOUMANIAN CONFIRMING PROOF OF SERVICE OF MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL AND ALL MOVING PAPERS ON THE PLAINTIFF (12-21-21)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF FRANCIS TRAN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS VANDERVEER INDUSTRIAL PLASTICS, LLC'S AND FRANCIS TRAN'S MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE AND REQUEST FOR COSTS AND FEES

12/22/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF FRANCIS TRAN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS VANDERVEER INDUSTRIAL PLASTICS, LLC'S AND FRANCIS TRAN'S MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE AND REQUEST FOR COSTS AND FEES

Declaration - DECLARATION OF ROBERT LANCASTER IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS VANDERVEER INDUSTRIAL PLASTICS, LLCS AND FRANCIS TRANS MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE AND REQUEST FOR COSTS AND FEES

12/22/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF ROBERT LANCASTER IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS VANDERVEER INDUSTRIAL PLASTICS, LLCS AND FRANCIS TRANS MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE AND REQUEST FOR COSTS AND FEES

Motion for Change of Venue

12/22/2021: Motion for Change of Venue

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/19/2022
  • DocketClerk's Certification of Reproduced Court Records; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • DocketReceipt for Transmitted Record; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • DocketNotice of Outgoing Transfer; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 58; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 58; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 58; Non-Appearance Case Review (Re Payment of Transfer Fees by Plaintiff) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re Payment of Transfer Fees by Pla...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by VANDERVEER INDUSTRIAL PLASTICS (Defendant); FRANCIS TRAN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 58; Hearing on Motion for Change of Venue - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketMotion to Be Relieved as Counsel; Filed by Nancy P Doumanian (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by VANESSA ESCALERA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint (1st)); Filed by VANESSA ESCALERA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint; Filed by VANESSA ESCALERA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by VANESSA ESCALERA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by VANESSA ESCALERA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by VANESSA ESCALERA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: *******7310 Hearing Date: February 22, 2022 Dept: 58

On Feb. 14, 2022, parties filed a joint stipulation to change venue from Los Angeles to Orange County, which is Defendant’s principal place of business and where the alleged breach occurred. Therefore, the Court GRANTS the parties’ joint request to change venue from Los Angeles to Orange County. All pending hearing dates are advanced and vacated. The Court DENIES Defendant’s request for sanctions in light of both the joint stipulation and Plaintiff’s change of counsel that took place on January 4, 2021 that appears to have held up the joint stipulation.

MOTION OFF CALENDAR.


related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer NAVASARTIAN DAVID OWEN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HAUBRICH JR. JOHN