This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/24/2022 at 15:43:20 (UTC).

VANESSA ASTORGA VS SAN FERNANDO COMMUNITY HEALTH CENTER, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/30/2022 VANESSA ASTORGA filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against SAN FERNANDO COMMUNITY HEALTH CENTER,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7584

  • Filing Date:

    11/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ASTORGA VANESSA

Defendants

MORENO ELIZABETH

SAN FERNANDO COMMUNITY HEALTH CENTER

SAN FERNANDO COMMUNITY HOSPITAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

DAVID JOHN

SHEGERIAN CARNEY R.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

11/30/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/30/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/30/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/30/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

11/30/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

11/30/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

11/30/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/15/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/30/2023
  • Hearing03/30/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 34 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Carney R. Shegerian (Attorney): Name Suffix: blank

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketAddress for Carney R. Shegerian (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 03/30/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 34

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Michael P. Linfield in Department 34 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Vanessa Astorga (Plaintiff); As to: San Fernando Community Health Center (Defendant); San Fernando Community Hospital (Defendant); Elizabeth Moreno (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Vanessa Astorga (Plaintiff); As to: San Fernando Community Health Center (Defendant); San Fernando Community Hospital (Defendant); Elizabeth Moreno (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Vanessa Astorga (Plaintiff); As to: San Fernando Community Health Center (Defendant); San Fernando Community Hospital (Defendant); Elizabeth Moreno (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SAN FERNANDO COMMUNITY HOSPITAL is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DAVID JOHN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Shegerian, Carney R