This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/10/2020 at 03:43:36 (UTC).

VAN BUREN PLACE INC ET AL VS CROWN ACQUISITIONS FUND LLC

Case Summary

On 08/08/2018 VAN BUREN PLACE INC filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against CROWN ACQUISITIONS FUND LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are KENNETH R. FREEMAN and ELIHU M. BERLE. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6027

  • Filing Date:

    08/08/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

KENNETH R. FREEMAN

ELIHU M. BERLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

JANKO ANDREW

BUTLER ELIZABETH

BUTLER JEFFREY

SUIZA DANNY

JANKO TATIJANA

ANUPAMA RAO

VAN BUREN PLACE INC.

URALA VISWANATH

SUIZA TAMARA

Respondents and Defendants

DOES 1 THROUGH 1000

CROWN ACQUISITIONS FUND LLC

CROWN ACQUISITIONS FUND LLC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

FAIRCHILD & WADE LLP

MILSTEIN JACKSON FAIRCHILD & WADE LLP

JACKSON LEE

STAFFELDT JONATHAN PAUL

MAKARCZYK MAYO LAWRENCE

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

WALTON JOHN R. ESQ.

WALTON JOHN R

WALTON JOHN RICHARDSON ESQ.

VAQAR ALI ZAMIN ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NOT ENTERED

4/27/2020: Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NOT ENTERED

Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NOT ENTERED

4/10/2020: Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NOT ENTERED

Unknown - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE DUE TO COVID-19 STATE OF EMERGENCY DECLARATIONS

4/17/2020: Unknown - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE DUE TO COVID-19 STATE OF EMERGENCY DECLARATIONS

Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

4/17/2020: Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

Notice of Continuance - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

7/9/2019: Notice of Continuance - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Other - - (1) DEFENDANT CROWN ACQUISITIONS FUND, LLC'S REPORT RE MEDIATION AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER; (2) DECLARATION OF ALI VAQAR

7/11/2019: Other - - (1) DEFENDANT CROWN ACQUISITIONS FUND, LLC'S REPORT RE MEDIATION AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER; (2) DECLARATION OF ALI VAQAR

Declaration - DECLARATION OF MAYO L. MAKARCZYK REGARDING STATUS OF DISCOVERY AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

7/11/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF MAYO L. MAKARCZYK REGARDING STATUS OF DISCOVERY AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

Other - - JOINT REPORT IN ADVANCE OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

2/18/2020: Other - - JOINT REPORT IN ADVANCE OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Notice of Ruling

2/24/2020: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)

2/24/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)

Other - - JOINT REPORT IN ADVANCE OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

1/3/2020: Other - - JOINT REPORT IN ADVANCE OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)

1/7/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)

Notice of Ruling

1/8/2020: Notice of Ruling

Order - CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

10/3/2019: Order - CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

Notice - NOTICE OF FILING OF PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

10/2/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF FILING OF PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

Case Management Statement - JOINT REPORT IN ADVANCE OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

9/13/2019: Case Management Statement - JOINT REPORT IN ADVANCE OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO USE CERTIFIED SHORTHAND REPORTER VIENNA NGUYEN, CSR # 13137

9/17/2019: Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO USE CERTIFIED SHORTHAND REPORTER VIENNA NGUYEN, CSR # 13137

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC); STATUS CONFERENCE)

9/17/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC); STATUS CONFERENCE)

45 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/12/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Van Buren Place, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Not Entered); Filed by Van Buren Place, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 6, Elihu M. Berle, Presiding; Order to Show Cause - Settlement - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • DocketNotice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • DocketClerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (NOT ENTERED); Filed by Van Buren Place, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 6, Elihu M. Berle, Presiding; Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Rao Anupama (Plaintiff); Elizabeth Butler (Plaintiff); Jeffrey Butler (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketJoint Report in Advance of Continued Case Management Conference; Filed by Van Buren Place, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
54 More Docket Entries
  • 09/27/2018
  • DocketStipulation and Order; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Van Buren Place, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • Docketat 00:00 AM in Department 14; (Order-Complex Determination; Case Determined to be Complex) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2018-08-24 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Van Buren Place, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Van Buren Place, Inc. (Plaintiff); Jeffrey Butler (Plaintiff); Elizabeth Butler (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CROWN ACQUISITIONS FUND LLC is a litigant