This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/19/2022 at 20:46:59 (UTC).

VALLEY VILLAGE AFFORDABLE HOUSING PARTNERS, L.P. VS VALLEY VILLAGE SENIOR HOUSING LP

Case Summary

On 07/07/2020 VALLEY VILLAGE AFFORDABLE HOUSING PARTNERS, L P filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against VALLEY VILLAGE SENIOR HOUSING LP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MEL RED RECANA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5428

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MEL RED RECANA

 

Party Details

Cross Defendant and Plaintiff

VALLEY VILLAGE AFFORDABLE HOUSING PARTNERS L.P.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

VALLEY VILLAGE SENIOR HOUSING LP

Not Classified By Court

GHC HOUSING PARTNERS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

HERZOG JULIE A

Cross Defendant Attorney

MOSES CATHY T.

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE SUPPLEMENT TO MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT

6/15/2022: Notice - NOTICE SUPPLEMENT TO MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT

Trial Brief

6/8/2022: Trial Brief

Exhibit List - EXHIBIT LIST JOINT

6/8/2022: Exhibit List - EXHIBIT LIST JOINT

Witness List - WITNESS LIST JOINT

6/8/2022: Witness List - WITNESS LIST JOINT

Jury Instructions - JURY INSTRUCTIONS [PROPOSED]

6/8/2022: Jury Instructions - JURY INSTRUCTIONS [PROPOSED]

Trial Brief

5/23/2022: Trial Brief

Notice - NOTICE RE JOINT WITNESS LISTS, JURY INSTRUCTIONS, AND TRIAL EXHIBITS

5/23/2022: Notice - NOTICE RE JOINT WITNESS LISTS, JURY INSTRUCTIONS, AND TRIAL EXHIBITS

Notice - NOTICE MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT

5/23/2022: Notice - NOTICE MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT

Trial Brief

5/24/2022: Trial Brief

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING SUBMISSIONS BEFORE FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

5/25/2022: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING SUBMISSIONS BEFORE FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 05/25/2022

5/25/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 05/25/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

5/25/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING SUBMISSIONS BEFORE FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

5/27/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING SUBMISSIONS BEFORE FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Declaration - DECLARATION OF DANIEL HARSHMAN IN SUPPORT OF GHC HOUSING PARTNERS, LLCS MOTION TO DISCQUALIFY COX CASTLE NICHOLSON FROM ITS ADVERSE REPRESENTATION AND MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER

5/19/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF DANIEL HARSHMAN IN SUPPORT OF GHC HOUSING PARTNERS, LLCS MOTION TO DISCQUALIFY COX CASTLE NICHOLSON FROM ITS ADVERSE REPRESENTATION AND MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER

Declaration - DECLARATION OF GREGORY PERLMAN IN SUPPORT OF GHC HOUSING PARTNERS, LLCS MOTION TO DISQUALIFY COX CASTLE NICHOLSON FROM ITS ADVERSE REPRESENTATION AND MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER

5/19/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF GREGORY PERLMAN IN SUPPORT OF GHC HOUSING PARTNERS, LLCS MOTION TO DISQUALIFY COX CASTLE NICHOLSON FROM ITS ADVERSE REPRESENTATION AND MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER

Motion to Disqualify Counsel

5/19/2022: Motion to Disqualify Counsel

Declaration - DECLARATION OF RJ MILLER IN SUPPORT OF GHC HOUSING PARTNERS, LLCS MOTION TO DISCQUALIFY COX CASTLE NICHOLSON FROM ITS ADVERSE REPRESENTATION AND MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER

5/19/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF RJ MILLER IN SUPPORT OF GHC HOUSING PARTNERS, LLCS MOTION TO DISCQUALIFY COX CASTLE NICHOLSON FROM ITS ADVERSE REPRESENTATION AND MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER

Motion for Summary Adjudication

10/21/2021: Motion for Summary Adjudication

79 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/29/2022
  • Hearing08/29/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 45 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion for Protective Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • Hearing07/05/2022 at 09:00 AM in Department 45 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • Hearing06/21/2022 at 09:00 AM in Department 45 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • Hearing06/21/2022 at 09:00 AM in Department 45 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketNotice (Supplement to Mandatory Settlement Conference Statement); Filed by VALLEY VILLAGE AFFORDABLE HOUSING PARTNERS, L.P. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketTrial Brief; Filed by VALLEY VILLAGE SENIOR HOUSING LP (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketJury Instructions ([Proposed]); Filed by VALLEY VILLAGE AFFORDABLE HOUSING PARTNERS, L.P. (Plaintiff); VALLEY VILLAGE SENIOR HOUSING LP (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketExhibit List (Joint); Filed by VALLEY VILLAGE AFFORDABLE HOUSING PARTNERS, L.P. (Plaintiff); VALLEY VILLAGE SENIOR HOUSING LP (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketWitness List (Joint); Filed by VALLEY VILLAGE AFFORDABLE HOUSING PARTNERS, L.P. (Plaintiff); VALLEY VILLAGE SENIOR HOUSING LP (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketNotice (of Entry of Stipulation and Order Regarding Submissions Before Final Status Conference); Filed by VALLEY VILLAGE AFFORDABLE HOUSING PARTNERS, L.P. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
84 More Docket Entries
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by VALLEY VILLAGE SENIOR HOUSING LP (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by VALLEY VILLAGE SENIOR HOUSING LP (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by VALLEY VILLAGE AFFORDABLE HOUSING PARTNERS, L.P. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • DocketNotice (OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE); Filed by VALLEY VILLAGE AFFORDABLE HOUSING PARTNERS, L.P. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by VALLEY VILLAGE AFFORDABLE HOUSING PARTNERS, L.P. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by VALLEY VILLAGE AFFORDABLE HOUSING PARTNERS, L.P. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by VALLEY VILLAGE AFFORDABLE HOUSING PARTNERS, L.P. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by VALLEY VILLAGE AFFORDABLE HOUSING PARTNERS, L.P. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Moses, Cathy T.