This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/04/2023 at 00:23:16 (UTC).

VALERIE SMITH, ET AL. VS DANIEL WELLS, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/30/2023 VALERIE SMITH, filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against DANIEL WELLS,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Beverly Hills Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is EDWARD B. MORETON, JR.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0404

  • Filing Date:

    01/30/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

EDWARD B. MORETON, JR.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SMITH ROBERT

SMITH VALERIE

Defendants

WELLS DANIEL

WELLS DAVID

WELLS REBECCA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

DOUGLASS JONATHAN WARREN

SHIHADY MARK GEORGE

FOWLER JASON PAUL

 

Court Documents

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/30/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

1/30/2023: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/30/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/30/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

1/31/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/31/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Case Management Statement

7/13/2023: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

7/25/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

7/31/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2023
  • Hearing10/04/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department 205 at 9355 Burton Way, Beverly Hills, CA 90210; Order to Show Cause Re: Sanctions for Failure to File Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2023
  • Hearing10/04/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department 205 at 9355 Burton Way, Beverly Hills, CA 90210; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 10/04/2023 at 09:00 AM in Beverly Hills Courthouse at Department 205

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Sanctions for Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 10/04/2023 at 09:00 AM in Beverly Hills Courthouse at Department 205

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 07/31/2023 at 08:30 AM in Beverly Hills Courthouse at Department 205 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 10/04/2023 09:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2023
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Valerie Smith (Plaintiff); Robert Smith (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2023
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: Valerie Smith (Plaintiff); Robert Smith (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 07/31/2023 at 08:30 AM in Beverly Hills Courthouse at Department 205

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Edward B. Moreton, Jr. in Department 205 Beverly Hills Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Valerie Smith (Plaintiff); Robert Smith (Plaintiff); As to: Daniel Wells (Defendant); David Wells (Defendant); Rebecca Wells (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Valerie Smith (Plaintiff); Robert Smith (Plaintiff); As to: Daniel Wells (Defendant); David Wells (Defendant); Rebecca Wells (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Valerie Smith (Plaintiff); Robert Smith (Plaintiff); As to: Daniel Wells (Defendant); David Wells (Defendant); Rebecca Wells (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less