This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/08/2019 at 16:21:38 (UTC).

VALERIE RUIZ VS MARIA RAMIREZ

Case Summary

On 04/05/2018 VALERIE RUIZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MARIA RAMIREZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0604

  • Filing Date:

    04/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

RUIZ VALERIE

Defendants and Respondents

RAMIREZ MARIA

DOES 1 TO 25

Guardian Ad Litem and Not Yet Classified

ALVAREZ NINIVE GARCIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

ZEYTUNTSYAN ANDREW ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

FRANCIS MARTIN

MARTIN FRANCIS

Other Attorneys

ZEYTUNTSYAN ANDREW

 

Court Documents

Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim

11/12/2019: Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim

Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgme - ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PROCEEDS OF JUDGM

11/22/2019: Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgme - ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PROCEEDS OF JUDGM

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON PETITION TO CONFIRM MINOR'S COMPROMISE)

11/22/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON PETITION TO CONFIRM MINOR'S COMPROMISE)

Order to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account

11/22/2019: Order to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT) OF 09/04/2019

9/4/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT) OF 09/04/2019

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT)

9/4/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT)

Notice of Settlement

9/4/2019: Notice of Settlement

CIVIL DEPOSIT -

8/9/2018: CIVIL DEPOSIT -

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

8/9/2018: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

DEMAND FOR JURY

8/9/2018: DEMAND FOR JURY

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM- CIVIL EX PARTE

5/23/2018: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM- CIVIL EX PARTE

SUMMONS -

6/13/2018: SUMMONS -

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

7/2/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

NOTICE OF REJECTION - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

4/19/2018: NOTICE OF REJECTION - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

4/19/2018: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -

4/5/2018: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/31/2019
  • Hearing12/31/2019 at 08:30 AM in Department 5 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Hearing on Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketOrder Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgment for Minor or Person With a Disability (Miscellaneous); Filed by Ninive Garcia Alvarez (Legacy Party); Valerie Ruiz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketOrder to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account; Filed by Ninive Garcia Alvarez (Legacy Party); Valerie Ruiz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Hearing on Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketPetition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim; Filed by Ninive Garcia Alvarez (Legacy Party); Valerie Ruiz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • Docketat 08:25 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 06/13/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • DocketSummons Issued; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • DocketApplication ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • DocketAPPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM- CIVIL EX PARTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF REJECTION - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • DocketApplication ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • DocketAPPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Valerie Ruiz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC700604    Hearing Date: November 22, 2019    Dept: 5

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 5

VALERIE RUIZ.

Plaintiff,

v.

MARIA RAMIREZ,

Defendant.

Case No.: BC700604

[TENTATIVE] order RE:

petition to approve compromise of pending action

The Court has reviewed the petition by Petitioner Ninive Garcia Alvarez on behalf of Claimant Valerie Ruiz and finds the settlement is fair and reasonable. The Court is prepared to approve the settlement.

DATED: November 22, 2019 ___________________________

Stephen I. Goorvitch

Judge of the Superior Court