Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/23/2020 at 23:53:08 (UTC).

VALERIE F. HORN VS VANESSA RAICEVIC

Case Summary

On 01/11/2018 VALERIE F HORN filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against VANESSA RAICEVIC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MITCHELL L. BECKLOFF, GERALD ROSENBERG and MARC D. GROSS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8673

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MITCHELL L. BECKLOFF

GERALD ROSENBERG

MARC D. GROSS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Petitioners, Respondents and Cross Defendants

VALERIE F. HORN & ASSOCIATES APLC

HORN VALERIE F.

HORN VALERIE F. ESQ.

VALIERIE F. HORN & ASSOCIATES APLC

VALERIE F. HORN CROSS-DEFENDANT

VALERIE F. HORN & ASSOCIATES

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Appellants

RAICEVIC VANESSA

RAICEVIC RADE

RAICEVIC VANESSA & RAICEVIC RADE

VANESSA RAICEVIC

RADE RAICEVIC

RAICEVIC KATARINA

RAICEVIC MARIJANA

Other

HORN STEVEN J. LAW OFFICES OF

15760 Ventura Blvd. Ste.1520

Encino, CA 91436-3095

Respondent, Cross Defendant and Not Classified By Court

VALERIE F. HORN CROSS-DEFENDANT

9 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

HORN VALERIE F.

HORN STEVEN J. LAW OFFICES OF

HORN STEVEN JEFFRY

HORN VALERIE FAITH ESQ.

LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

BECKER BARTLEY LOUIS

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

RUBIN MICHAEL P.

JARED XU

SULLIVAN JOHN

 

Court Documents

Writ - Return

5/4/2020: Writ - Return

Application and Order for Appearance and Examination - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION AS TO MARIJANA REICEVIC

8/1/2019: Application and Order for Appearance and Examination - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION AS TO MARIJANA REICEVIC

Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

3/5/2020: Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

Appellate Order Dismissing Appeal - APPELLATE ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL NOA: 03/19/20 B296515

12/20/2019: Appellate Order Dismissing Appeal - APPELLATE ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL NOA: 03/19/20 B296515

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: NOTICE OF MOTION

6/12/2018: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: NOTICE OF MOTION

Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103

5/3/2019: Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103

Notice of Default

4/15/2019: Notice of Default

Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed

3/20/2019: Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL

3/21/2019: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL

Notice - NOTICE ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT - CIVIL AND SMALL CLAIMS RECORDED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY

3/20/2019: Notice - NOTICE ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT - CIVIL AND SMALL CLAIMS RECORDED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY

Case Management Statement

2/22/2019: Case Management Statement

Substitution of Attorney

2/7/2019: Substitution of Attorney

Separate Statement - Separate Statement In Support Of Plaintiff's Motion To Compel Defendant's Further Responses To Request For Production Of Documents And For An Order Compelling Compliance

12/28/2018: Separate Statement - Separate Statement In Support Of Plaintiff's Motion To Compel Defendant's Further Responses To Request For Production Of Documents And For An Order Compelling Compliance

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Notice

6/26/2018: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Notice

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Ex-Parte Application

7/30/2018: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Ex-Parte Application

Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order -

9/10/2018: Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order -

Notice of Motion - and Motion to Compel

7/10/2018: Notice of Motion - and Motion to Compel

Other - - Civil Deposit

7/10/2018: Other - - Civil Deposit

236 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/12/2020
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department M; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses (previously set on December 13, 2019,) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketWrit - Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department M; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses (previously set on December 6, 2019,) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department M; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses (previously set on November 22, 2019,) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department M; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses (previously scheduled on May 7, 2019,) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department M; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses (previously scheduled for May 8, 2019,) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • DocketWrit - Return; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department O; Jury Trial ((5 days)) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department O; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department O; Hearing on Motion for Order (Motion for an Order Appointing A Discovery Referee) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
406 More Docket Entries
  • 03/08/2018
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by Vanessa Raicevic (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Rade Raicevic (Defendant); Vanessa Raicevic (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed; Filed by Defendant, & Defendant in Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • DocketCross-Compl fld- No Summons Issued (VANESSA RAICEVIC IN PRO PER ); Filed by Defendant and Cross-Complainant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • DocketCross-Compl fld- No Summons Issued; Filed by Vanessa Raicevic (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • DocketComplaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • DocketSummons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by VALERIE F. HORN & ASSOCIATES, APLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by VALERIE F. HORN & ASSOCIATES, APLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VALERIE F. HORN & ASSOCIATES is a litigant