Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/17/2019 at 21:56:42 (UTC).

VALERIE BARAJAS VS NORMS RESTAURANTS LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/27/2017 VALERIE BARAJAS filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against NORMS RESTAURANTS LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1568

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

BARAJAS VALERIE

Defendants and Respondents

NORMS RESTAURANTS LLC

DOES 1 TO 15

NORMS RESTAURANTS HOLDINGS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

HARIRI RAMIN

Defendant Attorney

CRAWFORD SHELBY B. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME

6/7/2018: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME

Request for Dismissal

9/26/2018: Request for Dismissal

DEFENDANTS NORMS RESTAURANTS, LLC AND NORMS RESTAURANTS HOLDINGS, LLC'S ANSWER TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT, AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

12/12/2017: DEFENDANTS NORMS RESTAURANTS, LLC AND NORMS RESTAURANTS HOLDINGS, LLC'S ANSWER TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT, AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

Unknown

12/12/2017: Unknown

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

11/7/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

11/7/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

AMENDED CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET

10/31/2017: AMENDED CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET

SUMMONS

10/27/2017: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

10/27/2017: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/26/2018
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by VALERIE BARAJAS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • Notice of Change of Firm Name; Filed by NORMS RESTAURANTS, LLC (Defendant); NORMS RESTAURANTS HOLDINGS, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • Receipt; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • DEFENDANTS NORMS RESTAURANTS, LLC AND NORMS RESTAURANTS HOLDINGS, LLC'S ANSWER TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT, AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • CIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • Answer; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • Miscellaneous-Other; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • AMENDED CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by VALERIE BARAJAS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NORMS RESTAURANTS LLC A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hariri, Ramin