This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/04/2021 at 03:07:11 (UTC).

VALERIA SEGOVIANO HERNANDEZ VS WALMART INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/18/2021 VALERIA SEGOVIANO HERNANDEZ filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against WALMART INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8579

  • Filing Date:

    05/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SEGOVIANO HERNANDEZ VALERIA

Defendants

WALMART INC.

THE CLOROX COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCGREAL THOMAS

Defendant Attorneys

CHUANG ANNIE YU-SUAN

TURNER MEGHAN

 

Court Documents

Answer - ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

7/30/2021: Answer - ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Answer

7/8/2021: Answer

Demand for Jury Trial

7/8/2021: Demand for Jury Trial

Proof of Personal Service

6/14/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

6/14/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

6/21/2021: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

PI General Order

6/4/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

6/4/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/18/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/18/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/18/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/18/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

5/18/2021: Complaint

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/14/2024
  • Hearing05/14/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • Hearing11/15/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • Hearing11/01/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketAnswer (TO PLAINTIFF?S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT); Filed by The Clorox Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Walmart Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Walmart Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketAmended Complaint ( (1st)); Filed by Valeria Segoviano Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Valeria Segoviano Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Valeria Segoviano Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Valeria Segoviano Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Valeria Segoviano Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Valeria Segoviano Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Valeria Segoviano Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE CLOROX COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where WALMART is a litigant