This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/24/2021 at 16:50:31 (UTC).

VALERIA MARTINEZ, ET AL. VS RITZCARE HEALTH SERVICES, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/09/2021 VALERIA MARTINEZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against RITZCARE HEALTH SERVICES, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5254

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MARTINEZ MARVIN

MARTINEZ VALERIA

TEJADA PAULINA

Defendants

NGUY SIMON

RITZCARE HEALTH SERVICES A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

OBEID MARCELLE ALEXANDRA

VERA EDGAR

Defendant Attorney

LYON CHRISTOPHER P.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

8/12/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

8/3/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Demand for Jury Trial

8/3/2021: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer

8/3/2021: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

7/23/2021: Proof of Personal Service

PI General Order

7/13/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

7/13/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Complaint

7/9/2021: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/9/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/9/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/12/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/05/2024
  • Hearing07/05/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • Hearing01/06/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • Hearing12/23/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Valeria Martinez (Plaintiff); Marvin Martinez (Plaintiff); Paulina Tejada (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Ritzcare Health Services, a California Corporation (Defendant); Simon Nguy (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Ritzcare Health Services, a California Corporation (Defendant); Simon Nguy (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Ritzcare Health Services, a California Corporation (Defendant); Simon Nguy (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Valeria Martinez (Plaintiff); Marvin Martinez (Plaintiff); Paulina Tejada (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Valeria Martinez (Plaintiff); Marvin Martinez (Plaintiff); Paulina Tejada (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Valeria Martinez (Plaintiff); Marvin Martinez (Plaintiff); Paulina Tejada (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Valeria Martinez (Plaintiff); Marvin Martinez (Plaintiff); Paulina Tejada (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LYON CHRISTOPHER P. ESQUIRE