This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/17/2019 at 21:12:53 (UTC).

VALERI JEAN LARSEN VS AUGUSTIN VALDEZ

Case Summary

On 01/20/2017 VALERI JEAN LARSEN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against AUGUSTIN VALDEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7651

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

LARSEN VALERI JEAN

Defendants and Respondents

VALDEZ AUGUSTIN

DOES 1 TO 50

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

PHILLIPI STEVEN V. ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

BILLINGTON CRAIG ESQ.

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS

1/20/2017: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES BASED UPON NEGLIGENCE (PERSONAL INJURIES)

1/20/2017: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES BASED UPON NEGLIGENCE (PERSONAL INJURIES)

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

2/10/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

3/6/2017: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

DEMAND FOR JURY

3/6/2017: DEMAND FOR JURY

Unknown

3/6/2017: Unknown

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

6/13/2017: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/20/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 98; Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2018
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 98; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Valeri Jean Larsen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • Answer; Filed by Augustin Valdez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • DEMAND FOR JURY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by Augustin Valdez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • CIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • Receipt; Filed by Augustin Valdez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Valeri Jean Larsen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by Valeri Jean Larsen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2017
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES BASED UPON NEGLIGENCE (PERSONAL INJURIES)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer PHILLIPI STEVEN V. ESQ.