This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/20/2022 at 08:18:44 (UTC).

VALENTINA GONZALEZ, ET AL. VS SILVIA ROMO

Case Summary

On 07/27/2021 VALENTINA GONZALEZ filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against SILVIA ROMO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GREGORY KEOSIAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7462

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GREGORY KEOSIAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GONZALEZ VALENTINA

RUIZ GONZALEZ RICARDO

Defendant

ROMO SILVIA DBA RICARDO'S TRAVEL AND INSURANCE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BYBERG GREGORY B

Defendant Attorney

HEIM JON

 

Court Documents

Complaint

7/27/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/27/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/27/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/27/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Proof of Service by Mail

9/2/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

Answer

9/2/2021: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

8/16/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/10/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

8/10/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Case Management Statement

12/15/2021: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

12/16/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Order

12/16/2021: Case Management Order

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

12/23/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/24/2023
  • Hearing10/24/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department 61 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2023
  • Hearing10/16/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department 61 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2023
  • Hearing08/16/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department 61 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Post-Mediation Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by VALENTINA GONZALEZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 61, Gregory Keosian, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketCase Management Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by VALENTINA GONZALEZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 61, Gregory Keosian, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by SILVIA ROMO (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by SILVIA ROMO (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by VALENTINA GONZALEZ (Plaintiff); RICARDO RUIZ GONZALEZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by VALENTINA GONZALEZ (Plaintiff); RICARDO RUIZ GONZALEZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by VALENTINA GONZALEZ (Plaintiff); RICARDO RUIZ GONZALEZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by VALENTINA GONZALEZ (Plaintiff); RICARDO RUIZ GONZALEZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less