This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/13/2022 at 22:42:08 (UTC).

VALENTE CRUZ ARTEAGA, ET AL. VS NORWALK MEADOWS NURSING CENTER, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/02/2021 VALENTE CRUZ ARTEAGA, filed a Personal Injury - Elder/Dependant Adult Abuse lawsuit against NORWALK MEADOWS NURSING CENTER,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JOHN P. DOYLE and BRUCE G. IWASAKI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0738

  • Filing Date:

    06/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Elder/Dependant Adult Abuse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

JOHN P. DOYLE

BRUCE G. IWASAKI

 

Party Details

Petitioners

CRUZ ARTEAGA VALENTE

SANCHEZ REBECCA

Respondents

NORWALK MEADOWS NURSING CENTER

NORWALK MEADOWS NURSING CENTER LP DBA NORWALK MEADOWS NURSING CENTER

PREMIER B.H. INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

FLINT LISA TRINH

Respondent Attorney

MCVAY DEAN H

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL READINESS CONFERENCE (CONFERENCE: RE JOINT STATEMENT; C...)

6/7/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL READINESS CONFERENCE (CONFERENCE: RE JOINT STATEMENT; C...)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF DEAN H. MCVAY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT NORWALK MEADOWS NURSING CENTER; NORWALK MEADOWS NURSING CENTER, LP DBA NORWALK MEADOWS NURSING CENTER AND PREMIER B.H., INC.S MOTION

12/16/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF DEAN H. MCVAY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT NORWALK MEADOWS NURSING CENTER; NORWALK MEADOWS NURSING CENTER, LP DBA NORWALK MEADOWS NURSING CENTER AND PREMIER B.H., INC.S MOTION

Motion for Summary Judgment

12/16/2021: Motion for Summary Judgment

Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING OF EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES

12/16/2021: Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING OF EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES

Separate Statement

12/16/2021: Separate Statement

Declaration - DECLARATION OF DANIEL J. BRESSLER, M.D., IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

12/16/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF DANIEL J. BRESSLER, M.D., IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO CONTINUE DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

2/22/2022: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO CONTINUE DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

2/23/2022: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE (ALL-PURPOSE))

3/1/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE (ALL-PURPOSE))

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OPPOSITION DEADLINE

3/1/2022: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OPPOSITION DEADLINE

Notice of Ruling

3/2/2022: Notice of Ruling

Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF LODGMENT IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS NORWALK MEADOWS NURSING CENTER, LP DBA NORWALK MEADOWS NURSING CENTERS AND PREMIER

3/4/2022: Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF LODGMENT IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS NORWALK MEADOWS NURSING CENTER, LP DBA NORWALK MEADOWS NURSING CENTERS AND PREMIER

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF PAMELA SHARKEY, R.N. IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

3/4/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF PAMELA SHARKEY, R.N. IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

Objection - OBJECTION PLAINTIFFS EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO THE DECLARATION OF DANIEL J. BRESSLER, M.D., IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATIO

3/4/2022: Objection - OBJECTION PLAINTIFFS EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO THE DECLARATION OF DANIEL J. BRESSLER, M.D., IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATIO

Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

3/4/2022: Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

Separate Statement

3/4/2022: Separate Statement

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF DAVID E. RAMIREZ IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS NORWALK MEADOWS NURSING CENTER, LP DBA NORWALK MEADOWS NURSING CENTERS AND PREMIER B.H., INC

3/4/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF DAVID E. RAMIREZ IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS NORWALK MEADOWS NURSING CENTER, LP DBA NORWALK MEADOWS NURSING CENTERS AND PREMIER B.H., INC

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF ANDREW S. WACHTEL, M.D. IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

3/4/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF ANDREW S. WACHTEL, M.D. IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

44 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/18/2022
  • Hearing07/18/2022 at 09:00 AM in Department 58 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • Hearing07/12/2022 at 09:00 AM in Department 58 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • Hearing06/28/2022 at 3:00 PM in Department 58 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Appearance Case Review

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 58; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 58, Bruce G. Iwasaki, Presiding; Trial Readiness Conference ((ConferenceRe Joint Statement; Conference RePossible Referral to Long Cause)) - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Trial Readiness Conference (Conference: Re Joint Statement; C...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 58, Bruce G. Iwasaki, Presiding; Trial Readiness Conference - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Trial Readiness Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 58, Bruce G. Iwasaki, Presiding; Hearing - Other (Re Court of Appeal Issuance of an Alternative Writ of Mandate as to MSA) - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing Re Court of Appeal Issuance of an Alternative Writ of...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
60 More Docket Entries
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Valente Cruz Arteaga (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Valente Cruz Arteaga (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Valente Cruz Arteaga (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (Declaration of Juana Cruz to Commence Legal Action on Behalf of the Decedent Valente Cruz); Filed by Valente Cruz Arteaga (Petitioner); Rebecca Sanchez (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Petition); Filed by Valente Cruz Arteaga (Petitioner); Rebecca Sanchez (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Valente Cruz Arteaga (Petitioner); Rebecca Sanchez (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketPetition (Plaintiffs' Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial); Filed by Valente Cruz Arteaga (Petitioner); Rebecca Sanchez (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

b"

Case Number: *******0738 Hearing Date: October 29, 2021 Dept: 58

Judge John P. Doyle

Department 58


Hearing Date: October 29, 2021

Case Name: Arteaga, et al. v. Norwalk Meadows Nursing Center, et al.

Case No.: *******0738

Matter: Motion for Trial Preference

Moving Party: Plaintiffs Juana Cruz, as successor in interest to Valente Cruz Arteaga, and

Rebecca Sanchez

Responding Party: Defendants Norwalk Meadows Nursing Center, Norwalk Meadows

Nursing Center, LP, and Premier B.H., Inc.


Tentative Ruling: The Motion for Trial Preference is denied without prejudice.


On June 2, 2021, Plaintiffs Juana Cruz, as successor in interest to Valente Cruz Arteaga, and Rebecca Sanchez filed the opertice Complaint for (1) elder abuse (Welfare and Institutions Code ; 15600 et seq.), (2) negligence, (3) violation of Health & Safety Code ; 1430(b), (4) willful misconduct, and (5) and Wrongful Death.

Plaintiffs seek a trial preference under Code Civ. Proc. ; 36(a), (e). The request is premised on the facts that Plaintiff Cruz (1) is successor in interest to Arteaga, (2) is 90 years old, and (3) suffers from depression, hypertension, hypothyroidism, and acute bronchitis, which increase her likelihood of mortality.

Code Civ. Proc. ; 36 represents the Legislature’s determination that as a matter of public policy trial preference should be afforded to litigants who meet the statutory criteria. (Greenblatt v. Kaplan’s Restaurant (1985) 171 Cal.App.3d 991, 994 [“The obvious intent of the Legislature in enacting section 36 was to ensure that elderly persons not be denied their rights in civil litigation because of the current lengthy delays in having cases set for trial”].)

Code Civ. Proc. ; 36(a) states,

A party to a civil action who is over 70 years of age may petition the court for a preference, which the court shall grant if the court makes both of the following findings:

(1) The party has a substantial interest in the action as a whole.

(2) The health of the party is such that a preference is necessary to prevent prejudicing the party’s interest in the litigation.

Code Civ. Proc. ; 36(e) provides, “Notwithstanding any other provision of law, the court may in its discretion grant a motion for preference that is supported by a showing that satisfies the court that the interests of justice will be served by granting this preference.”

The evidence in support of the Motion is as follows: (1) Plaintiffs’ counsel’s declaration and (2) a Request for Judicial Notice.

The Request for Judicial Notice is granted because it presents undeniable, general facts about Cruz’s conditions. (Evid. Code ; 452(h).)

With regard to the declaration submitted by Plaintiffs’ counsel, it is sufficient to establish Cruz’s health conditions. (Code Civ. Proc. ; 36.5.) Notably, however, counsel’s declaration is not sufficient to establish Cruz’s age. (Weil et al., Cal. Prac. Guide Civ. Pro. Before Trial (The Rutter Guide 2021) Ch. 12(I)-C [“Admissible evidence is still required as to the party's age (e.g., declarations by party or admissible records showing he or she is over 70). The attorney's declaration is not sufficient for this purpose.”].)

As Plaintiffs have failed to show Cruz is over 70, they cannot obtain a preference under Code Civ. Proc. ; 36(a). The Court, in the exercise of its discretion, denies relief under Code Civ. Proc. ; 36(e) for the same reason.

In sum, the Motion is denied without prejudice.

"