This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/06/2022 at 15:46:01 (UTC).

VALENCIA TOWN CENTER VENTURE, L.P., A DELAWARE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP VS TIFFANYS HOUSE OF BOUNCE, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/28/2021 VALENCIA TOWN CENTER VENTURE, L P , A DELAWARE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against TIFFANYS HOUSE OF BOUNCE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7875

  • Filing Date:

    07/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VALENCIA TOWN CENTER VENTURE L.P. A DELAWARE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

Defendants

BLANKENSHIP IAN

BLANKENSHIP TIFFANY

TIFFANYS HOUSE OF BOUNCE DBA HOUSE OF BOUNCE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HUBEN BRIAN DAVID

 

Court Documents

Complaint

7/28/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/28/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/28/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/28/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Proof of Personal Service

8/2/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

8/2/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/2/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/2/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/24/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer

9/9/2021: Answer

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

10/8/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

10/8/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

12/2/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 12/02/2021

12/2/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 12/02/2021

Case Management Statement

11/19/2021: Case Management Statement

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2023
  • Hearing02/14/2023 at 09:30 AM in Department 56 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • Hearing02/07/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 56 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 56; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • Docketat 1:53 PM in Department 56; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 12/02/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by VALENCIA TOWN CENTER VENTURE, L.P., a Delaware limited partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by VALENCIA TOWN CENTER VENTURE, L.P., a Delaware limited partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketNotice (OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE); Filed by VALENCIA TOWN CENTER VENTURE, L.P., a Delaware limited partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 56; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by IAN BLANKENSHIP (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by VALENCIA TOWN CENTER VENTURE, L.P., a Delaware limited partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by VALENCIA TOWN CENTER VENTURE, L.P., a Delaware limited partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by VALENCIA TOWN CENTER VENTURE, L.P., a Delaware limited partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by VALENCIA TOWN CENTER VENTURE, L.P., a Delaware limited partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by VALENCIA TOWN CENTER VENTURE, L.P., a Delaware limited partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by VALENCIA TOWN CENTER VENTURE, L.P., a Delaware limited partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VALENCIA TOWN CENTER VENTURE L.P. A DELAWARE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HUBEN BRIAN