This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/09/2022 at 08:30:31 (UTC).

VALENCIA TOWN CENTER VENTURE, L.P., A DELAWARE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP VS CREPES DE PARIS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATIONG, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/20/2021 VALENCIA TOWN CENTER VENTURE, L P , A DELAWARE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CREPES DE PARIS, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATIONG. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DANIEL S. MURPHY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4927

  • Filing Date:

    04/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DANIEL S. MURPHY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VALENCIA TOWN CENTER VENTURE L.P. A DELAWARE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

Defendants

CREPES DE PARIS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATIONG DBA CREPES DE PARIS

LIU JENNY L.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HUBEN BRIAN

Defendant Attorney

HINDIN ROBERT MARC

 

Court Documents

Complaint

4/20/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/20/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/20/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/20/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Proof of Personal Service

4/26/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

4/26/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/23/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Answer

6/4/2021: Answer

Case Management Statement

8/5/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

8/13/2021: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

8/20/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Order

8/20/2021: Case Management Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2022
  • Hearing08/23/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • Hearing08/11/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 32, Daniel S. Murphy, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketCase Management Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Valencia Town Center Venture, L.P., a Delaware limited partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Crepes De Paris, Inc., a California corporationg (Defendant); Jenny L. Liu (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Crepes De Paris, Inc., a California corporationg (Defendant); Jenny L. Liu (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Valencia Town Center Venture, L.P., a Delaware limited partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Valencia Town Center Venture, L.P., a Delaware limited partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Valencia Town Center Venture, L.P., a Delaware limited partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Valencia Town Center Venture, L.P., a Delaware limited partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Valencia Town Center Venture, L.P., a Delaware limited partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Crepes De Paris, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where VALENCIA TOWN CENTER VENTURE L.P. A DELAWARE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HINDIN ROBERT MARC