This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/22/2021 at 11:45:08 (UTC).

VALENCIA, ROSE M. - DECEDENT

Case Summary

On 04/27/2021 VALENCIA, ROSE M - DECEDENT was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JUAREZ, DANIEL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4078

  • Filing Date:

    04/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JUAREZ, DANIEL

 

Party Details

Petitioner

PENALOZA ROSA M.

Claimants

DCM SERVICES

BANK OF AMERICA N.A.

DCM SERVICES ON BEHALF OF VERIZON WIRELESS

Decedent

VALENCIA ROSE M.

Not Classified By Court

GEORGE WILLIAM A.

REIFMAN IRVING

Interested Party

ADVANCE INHERITANCE LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

BEEKS GARY EUGENE

Interested Party Attorney

LEESTMA JAMES LAMBERT

 

Court Documents

Petition - Letters of Administration (Initial)

4/27/2021: Petition - Letters of Administration (Initial)

Proof of Publication - Proof of Publication

5/10/2021: Proof of Publication - Proof of Publication

Notice - Petition to Administer Estate

4/30/2021: Notice - Petition to Administer Estate

Creditor's Claim

5/19/2021: Creditor's Claim

Creditor's Claim - Lakewood Regional Medical Center

5/18/2021: Creditor's Claim - Lakewood Regional Medical Center

Minute Order

6/10/2021: Minute Order

Order - Probate

6/23/2021: Order - Probate

Letters (Initial)

8/11/2021: Letters (Initial)

Bond - Suretec Insurance Company

8/11/2021: Bond - Suretec Insurance Company

Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative

8/10/2021: Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative

Request - Special Notice - Request for Special Notice

10/18/2021: Request - Special Notice - Request for Special Notice

Assignment - Assignment of Beneficial Interest in Decedent's Estate

10/18/2021: Assignment - Assignment of Beneficial Interest in Decedent's Estate

Notice - Proposed Action - Notice of Proposed Action

10/1/2021: Notice - Proposed Action - Notice of Proposed Action

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/10/2022
  • Hearing11/10/2022 at 8:30 AM in Probate Department 67 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; OSC Re Petition for Final Distribution or Status Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketRequest - Special Notice (Request for Special Notice ); Filed by Interested Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketAssignment (Assignment of Beneficial Interest in Decedent's Estate ); Filed by Interested Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketNotice - Proposed Action (Notice of Proposed Action ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketBond (Suretec Insurance Company ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketLetters (Initial); Filed by Decedent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketDuties and Liabilities - Personal Representative; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketConfidential Supplement to Duties and Liabilities; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketOrder - Probate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • Docketin Probate Department 67, Juarez, Daniel, Presiding; Appointment Hearing - Decedent's Estate - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketPetition Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketDISP: Granted-Initial Petition-After Crt Hrg/Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketCreditor's Claim; Filed by Claimant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketCreditor's Claim (Lakewood Regional Medical Center ); Filed by Claimant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketProof of Publication (Proof of Publication ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketNotice - Petition to Administer Estate; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketPetition - Letters of Administration (Initial); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ADVANCE INHERITANCE LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where DCM SERVICES is a litigant

Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant