Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/07/2020 at 09:06:12 (UTC).

VALENCIA-LASSEN, ANNETTE VS LASSEN, JASON A

Case Summary

On 03/19/2019 VALENCIA-LASSEN, ANNETTE filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against LASSEN, JASON A. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0398

  • Filing Date:

    03/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

VALENCIA-LASSEN ANNETTE

Respondent

LASSEN JASON A

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/20/2019
  • DocketNotice - Entry of Judgment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • DocketJudgment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • DocketDeclaration - Default FL170; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • DocketJudgment Package Received - FC2336; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • DocketDeclaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • DocketJudgment Package Received - FC2336 (REJECTED ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • DocketRequest - Enter Default FL165; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • DocketStipulation - Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • DocketDeclaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons (SERVED: 04/01/2019 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • DocketNotice - Case Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less