This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/26/2022 at 01:51:54 (UTC).

VALDEZ, RATIPORN TEDPRASITH VS VALDEZ, JACOB DANIEL

Case Summary

On 03/16/2022 VALDEZ, RATIPORN TEDPRASITH filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against VALDEZ, JACOB DANIEL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2895

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

VALDEZ RATIPORN TEDPRASITH

Respondent

VALDEZ JACOB DANIEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

O'YOUNG MICHAEL C

 

Court Documents

Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

3/17/2022: Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child

3/16/2022: Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

3/16/2022: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Declaration - Separate Property

3/16/2022: Declaration - Separate Property

Summons

3/16/2022: Summons

Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure

5/13/2022: Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure

Proof of Service of Summons

5/13/2022: Proof of Service of Summons

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketDeclaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketDeclaration - Separate Property; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer O'YOUNG MICHAEL