This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/10/2022 at 06:11:23 (UTC).

VALDEZ, MABEL VS MONTEPIEDRA, JOHN GLENN

Case Summary

On 07/23/2021 VALDEZ, MABEL filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against MONTEPIEDRA, JOHN GLENN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are BOSLEY, GIA G and VEASEY, GLENDA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0516

  • Filing Date:

    07/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

BOSLEY, GIA G

VEASEY, GLENDA

 

Party Details

Petitioner

VALDEZ MABEL

Respondent

MONTEPIEDRA JOHN GLENN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

SMITH ROBERT FREDERICK

 

Court Documents

Request - DV Prevention w/o Minor Child (Case Initiation)

7/23/2021: Request - DV Prevention w/o Minor Child (Case Initiation)

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

7/23/2021: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

7/23/2021: Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110) - Granted

7/23/2021: Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110) - Granted

Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

7/23/2021: Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

Minute Order

8/13/2021: Minute Order

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116) - Hrg on 09/08/21 at 8:30 am in Dept. J

8/13/2021: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116) - Hrg on 09/08/21 at 8:30 am in Dept. J

Proof of Service

7/28/2021: Proof of Service

Minute Order

9/8/2021: Minute Order

Stipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner

9/8/2021: Stipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner

Response - Domestic Violence

9/7/2021: Response - Domestic Violence

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/08/2021
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department J, Veasey, Glenda, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Dismissed - TRO-Lack of Prosecution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketStipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketResponse - Domestic Violence; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 11, Bosley, Gia G, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Held - Continued, TRO Reissued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116) (Hrg on 09/08/21 at 8:30 am in Dept. J ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketProof of Service; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketRequest - DV Prevention w/o Minor Child (Case Initiation); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110) (Granted ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer REED SMITH (LORENZO GASPARETTI)