This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/08/2021 at 22:42:02 (UTC).

VAL MAX VS DAVID DAWUD, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/05/2019 VAL MAX filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against DAVID DAWUD. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Burbank Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1006

  • Filing Date:

    11/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VAL MAX

Defendants

DAWUD DAVID

BERBERYAN ARA

MAXONE BUSINESS SERVICES PROPERTY MANAGEMENT

Not Classified By Court

MEKHITARIST FATHERS OF VIENNA

KNAPP PETERSEN & CLARKE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HAIRAPETIAN SHAHEN

Defendant Attorney

MNATZAGANIAN IVAN

Not Classified By Court Attorney

HUTTON GRETA TURNER

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL AND WITHDRAWAL OF AMENDED NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA FOR PERSONAL APPEARANCE AND PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND THINGS AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS BY NON PA

1/14/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL AND WITHDRAWAL OF AMENDED NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA FOR PERSONAL APPEARANCE AND PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND THINGS AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS BY NON PA

Declaration - DECLARATION OF GRETA T. HUTTON IN SUPPORT OF KNAPP, PETERSEN & CLARKES MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA FOR PERSONAL APPEARANCE AND PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND THINGS

12/23/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF GRETA T. HUTTON IN SUPPORT OF KNAPP, PETERSEN & CLARKES MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA FOR PERSONAL APPEARANCE AND PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND THINGS

Separate Statement - SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF KNAPP, PETERSEN & CLARKES MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA FOR PERSONAL APPEARANCE AND PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND THINGS

12/23/2020: Separate Statement - SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF KNAPP, PETERSEN & CLARKES MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA FOR PERSONAL APPEARANCE AND PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND THINGS

Notice - AMENDED NOTICE ON MOTION TO QUASH

12/29/2020: Notice - AMENDED NOTICE ON MOTION TO QUASH

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY (NOT "FURTHER DISCOVERY...)

11/13/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY (NOT "FURTHER DISCOVERY...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE)

9/23/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE)

Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

9/23/2020: Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

9/23/2020: Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

6/25/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

3/18/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/18/2020

3/18/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/18/2020

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

3/23/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/13/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/13/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/5/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

11/5/2019: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/5/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/6/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/09/2021
  • Hearing12/09/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department B at 300 East Olive, Burbank, CA 91502; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department B; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department B; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department B; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • Docketat 10:30 AM in Department B; Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • Docketat 09:45 AM in Department B; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 08/18/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by VAL MAX (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketNotice (OF CONTINUANCE OF FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE); Filed by VAL MAX (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
42 More Docket Entries
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by VAL MAX (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by VAL MAX (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by VAL MAX (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by VAL MAX (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by VAL MAX (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by VAL MAX (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by VAL MAX (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 19BBCV01006    Hearing Date: November 20, 2020    Dept: NCB

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

North Central District

Department B

val max,

Plaintiff,

v.

david dawud, et al.,

Defendants.

Case No.: 19BBCV01006

Hearing Date: November 20, 2020

[TENTATIVE] order RE:

motions to compel discovery responses; requests for sanctions

On September 23, 2020, Plaintiff Val Max (“Plaintiff”) filed 2 motions to compel initial responses from Defendant Maxone Business Services (“Maxone”) and Defendant David Dawud (“Dawud”) for Form Interrogatories (“FROG”), set one. Plaintiff seeks sanctions in the amount of $1,100 against each defendant.

On March 17, 2020, Plaintiff served on Maxone and Dawud the discovery requests. Plaintiff states that the time for Defendants to respond was extended to May 23, 2020, but Defendants did not provide any responses to the FROG. Thereafter, Plaintiff states that Defendants represented they would have responses by August 27, 2020. As of the filing of the motions, Plaintiff states that he has not received FROG responses from Defendants.

Plaintiff’s unopposed motions to compel responses to the FROG are granted pursuant to CCP §2030.290. Defendants Maxone and Dawud are each ordered to provide verified responses to Plaintiff’s FROG requests, without objections, within 20 days of notice of this order.

Plaintiff requests sanctions against each Maxone and Dawud in the amount of $1,100 for each motion. The request for sanctions is granted in the amount of $620 total (2 hours x a reasonable rate of $250/hour, plus $120 in filing fees) for these relatively simple and identical discovery motions). Defendants Maxone and Dawud are ordered to pay monetary sanctions in the total amount of $620 to Plaintiff, by and through counsel, within 20 days of notice of this order.

Plaintiff shall provide notice of this order.

Case Number: 19BBCV01006    Hearing Date: November 13, 2020    Dept: NCB

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

North Central District

Department B

val max,

Plaintiff,

v.

david dawud, et al.,

Defendants.

Case No.: 19BBCV01006

Hearing Date: November 13, 2020

[TENTATIVE] order RE:

motion to compel discovery responses; requests for sanctions

On September 23, 2020, Plaintiff Val Max (“Plaintiff”) filed a motion to compel initial responses for Form Interrogatories (“FROG”), set one against Defendant Ara Berberyan. Plaintiff seeks sanctions in the amount of $1,100.

On March 17, 2020, Plaintiff served on Berberyan the FROG requests. Plaintiff states that the time for Berberyan to respond was extended to May 23, 2020, but Berberyan did not provide any responses to the FROG. Thereafter, Plaintiff states that Berberyan represented she would have responses by August 27, 2020. As of the filing of the motions, Plaintiff states that he has not received responses from Berberyan.

Plaintiff’s unopposed motion to compel responses to the FROG from Defendant Berberyan is granted pursuant to CCP § 2030.290. Defendant Berberyan is ordered to provide verified responses to Plaintiff’s FROG requests, without objections, within 20 days of notice of this order.

Plaintiff requests sanctions against Berberyan only in the amount of $1,100 for bringing the motion. The request for sanctions is granted in the amount of $310 total (1 hour x a reasonable rate of $250/hour, plus $60 in filing fees) for this relatively simple motion to compel initial responses. Berberyan is ordered to pay monetary sanctions in the amount of $310 to Plaintiff, by and through counsel, within 20 days of notice of this order.

Plaintiff shall provide notice of this order.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KNAPP PETERSEN & CLARKE is a litigant

Latest cases where MEKHITARIST FATHERS OF VIENNA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HUTTON GRETA TURNER