This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/19/2021 at 17:05:39 (UTC).

VAHE ANDONIAN, ET AL. VS BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 10/12/2021 VAHE ANDONIAN filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7725

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ANDONIAN EDMOND

ANDONIAN VAHE

Defendant

BMW OF NORTH AMERICA LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOVASZ CHRISTOPHER

Defendant Attorney

SHAREGHI ARANI BEHROUZ

 

Court Documents

Complaint

10/12/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/12/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/12/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/12/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Proof of Personal Service

10/21/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Notice - NOTICE TO STATE COURT AND PLAINTIFF OF REMOVAL OF CIVIL ACTION TO FEDERAL COURT BY DEFENDANT BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC

11/12/2021: Notice - NOTICE TO STATE COURT AND PLAINTIFF OF REMOVAL OF CIVIL ACTION TO FEDERAL COURT BY DEFENDANT BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC

Answer

11/10/2021: Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2022
  • Hearing02/07/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 50 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketNotice (to State Court and Plaintiff of Removal of Civil Action to Federal Court by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC); Filed by BMW of North America, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by BMW of North America, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Vahe Andonian (Plaintiff); Edmond Andonian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Vahe Andonian (Plaintiff); Edmond Andonian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Vahe Andonian (Plaintiff); Edmond Andonian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Vahe Andonian (Plaintiff); Edmond Andonian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHAREGHI ARANI BEHROUZ